Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2767978

EP2767978 - NOISE SUPPRESSION IN A DETERIORATED AUDIO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/34]Audio signal processing
[2016/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.01.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2014/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Sugiyama, Akihiko
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1 Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
108-8001 Tokyo / JP
02 / Miyahara, Ryoji
c/o NEC Engineering Ltd.
4-10-27 Higashi-shinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
 [2014/52]
Former [2014/43]01 / Akihiko SUGIYAMA
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1 Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
108-8001 Tokyo / JP
02 / Miyahara, Ryoji
c/o NEC Engineering Ltd.
4-10-27 Higashi-shinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0002 / JP
Former [2014/34]01 / Akihiko SUGIYAMA
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1 Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
108-8001 Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/11]
Former [2014/34]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14167551.213.05.2011
[2014/34]
Priority number, dateJP2010011949525.05.2010         Original published format: JP 2010119495
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2767978
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2767978
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G10L21/0208, // G10L21/0232
[2014/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2014/34]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:UNTERDRÜCKUNG DES RAUSCHENS IN EINEM VERSCHLECHTERTEN AUDIOSIGNAL[2016/42]
English:NOISE SUPPRESSION IN A DETERIORATED AUDIO SIGNAL[2016/42]
French:SUPPRESSION DU BRUIT DANS UN SIGNAL AUDIO BRUITÉ DÉGRADÉ[2016/42]
Former [2014/34]Verarbeitung von Audio-Signalen
Former [2014/34]Audio signal processing
Former [2014/34]Traitement de signaux audio
Examination procedure20.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/15]
29.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.01.2017Fee for grant paid
03.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
25.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11786560.0  / EP2579255
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
MT13.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/23]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
IE13.05.2017
LU13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/17]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
LU13.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/06]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
LU31.05.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2002314637  (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,4,7-8 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0077]; figure 8 * [I] 5-6;
 [A]JP2003284181  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 5 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004]; figure 11 *
by applicantJP4282227B
 JPH08221092
 JP2006279185
 JP2008203879
    - M. BEROUTI; R. SCHWARTZ; J. MAKHOUL, "Enhancement of speech corrupted by acoustic noise", PROCEEDINGS OF ICASSP'79, (197904), pages 208 - 211, XP001079151