Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2801919 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2801919



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 445
07.05.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
01.03.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.02.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
25.01.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 12
25.01.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
15.11.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.11.2017 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
03.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
03.11.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.11.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
16.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.10.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 12
04.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.07.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.06.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.06.2017 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
06.06.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.05.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
08.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
09.08.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.08.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
11.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
11.04.2016 Description Search / examination 1
11.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
08.12.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.12.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
27.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.01.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
16.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.01.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.01.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
16.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
16.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
31.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
08.10.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
08.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
10.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 75
10.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 78
08.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
08.05.2014 Description Search / examination 53
08.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 46
08.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5