Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2801919


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.05.2018 Refusal of application published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
24.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
15.11.2017 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
05.06.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
26.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.08.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.12.2015 First examination report
30.01.2015 Change - designated states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
30.01.2015 Change - request for examination published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
27.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
21.11.2014 Change - inventor published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
11.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
10.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]