Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2801919 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410194324 EP14167566



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150053379Global Dossier 18.05.2015A
Priority number Date
KR20130135219 08.11.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102019128BGlobal Dossier 06.09.2019B1
KR20140133190 19.11.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130052929 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9324379Global Dossier 26.04.2016B2
US2014334797 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130135219 08.11.2013
KR20130052929 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104142799BGlobal Dossier 30.06.2017B
CN104142799 12.11.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130135219 08.11.2013
KR20130052929 10.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2801919Global Dossier 12.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130135219 08.11.2013
KR20130052929 10.05.2013