Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2801919

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure04.02.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140508
 
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:BA ME
 
Event date:12.11.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:LEE, JUNGMIN
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:KIM, YUNG
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:CHOI, HURAN
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:LEE, TAEYEON
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:LEE, HYEDEUK
 
Event date:24.12.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:CHOI, JEONGEUN
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:06.01.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20151208
 
Event date:13.06.2018 
Event description:APPLICATION REFUSED
Effective DATE:20180204