Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801919

EP2801919 - Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Taeyeon
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Yung
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
03 / Lee, Hyedeuk
219-24, Gasan-dong
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-801 / KR
04 / Lee, Jungmin
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
05 / Choi, Jeongeun
219-24, Gasan-dong
Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-801 / KR
06 / Choi, Huran
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
 [2014/52]
Former [2014/46]01 / Lee, Taeyeon
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Yung
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
03 / Lee, Hyedeuk
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
04 / Lee, Jungmin
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
05 / Choi, Jeongeun
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
06 / Choi, Huran
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date14167566.008.05.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateKR2013005292910.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130052929
KR2013013521908.11.2013         Original published format: KR 20130135219
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801919
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mobiles Endgerät und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[2014/46]
English:Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof[2014/46]
French:Terminal mobile et son procédé de contrôle[2014/46]
Examination procedure16.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/10]
08.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2017
16.11.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
25.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/24]
04.02.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007065044  (PARK TAE-SUH [KR] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * ref. 10;; figure 1 * * ref. 120;; figure 1 * * ref. 160;; figure 1 * * ref. 170;; figure 1 * * ref. S520;; figure 5 * * ref. S530;; figure 5, * * page 4, paragraph [0059] *;
 [Y]WO2011149648  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]; DEEVER AARON THOMAS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * reference 10;; figure 1 * * reference 30;; figure 1 * * reference 46;; figure 1 * * reference 20;; figure 1 * * page 22, line 3 - line 4 * * reference 245;; figure 8 * * reference 235;; figure 8 * * figures 8, reference 235 *;
 [A]WO2008127537  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]; LIBERT SCOTT ALLAN [US]; PEARCE JAMES EDWARD [) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007168867  (HIROI KAZUSHIGE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012293687  (KARN KEITH STOLL [US] ET AL) [A] 6 * the whole document *