Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805928

EP2805928 - Method and apparatus for sintering a glass preform for an optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Otosaka, Tetsuya
c/o Advanced Functional
Materials Research Center
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6170-27 Okunoya, Kamisu-shi
314-0116 Ibaraki / JP
02 / Uchida, Kazuya
c/o Advanced Functional
Materials Research Center
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6170-27 Okunoya, Kamisu-shi
314-0116 Ibaraki / JP
 [2017/49]
Former [2014/48]01 / Otosaka, Tetsuya
c/o Advanced Functionals
Materials Research Center
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
Okunoya
Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 6170-27 / JP
02 / Uchida, Kazuya
c/o Advanced Functionals
Materials Research Center
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
Okunoya
Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 6170-27 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/49]
Former [2014/48]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14167633.809.05.2014
[2014/48]
Priority number, dateJP2013010673121.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013106731
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805928
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805928
Date:06.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/014
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2014/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Sintern einer Vorform aus Glas für optische Fasern[2014/48]
English:Method and apparatus for sintering a glass preform for an optical fiber[2014/48]
French:Procédé et appareil de frittage d'une préforme en verre pour des fibres optiques[2014/48]
Examination procedure23.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
24.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.09.2017Fee for grant paid
26.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
30.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
GB09.05.2018
IE09.05.2018
LU09.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
GB09.05.2018
IE09.05.2018
LU09.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/19]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
IE09.05.2018
LU09.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
LU09.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/51]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/38]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/34]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/23]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
NO06.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP2008105904  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [AD] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2009292658  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2009120451  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2008179517  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2002226218  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS63159232  (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD) [A] 1,11 * abstract *
by applicantJP4737031B