Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802026

EP2802026 - Internal insulation design using porous material for an electrochemical cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Greatbatch Ltd.
10000 Wehrle Drive
Clarence, New York 14031 / US
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Krehl, Paul W.
9063 Michael Douglas
Clarence Center, NY New York 14032 / US
02 / Palazzo, Marcus J.
2498 Reynolds Street
Wheatfield, NY New York 14034 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/25]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
Former [2014/46]Koepe & Partner
Patentanwälte Robert-Koch-Strasse 1
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14167636.109.05.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateUS201361821849P10.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361821849 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802026
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802026
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01G11/06, H01G11/46, H01G11/84, H01M10/058, H01M2/22, H01M4/54, H01M4/58, H01M6/16, H01M2/16, H01M2/34, H01M4/485
[2016/49]
Former International [2014/46]H01M2/16, H01M2/34, H01M6/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Innenisolierungsdesign mit porösem Material für eine elektrochemische Zelle[2014/46]
English:Internal insulation design using porous material for an electrochemical cell[2014/46]
French:Conception d'isolation interne utilisant un matériau poreux pour cellule électrochimique[2014/46]
Examination procedure12.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
25.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.03.2017Fee for grant paid
20.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)22.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
[2019/06]
Former [2018/39]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
ES21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
IT21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
PL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
NL21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009061313  (TADANO JUNICHI [JP]) [I] 1-16 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0024] , [0026] , [0029] , [0030] , [0038] , [0039] *;
 [A]US2007059599  (RUBINO ROBERT S [US] ET AL) [A] 7 * paragraph [0034]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US2008085451  (FREITAG GARY [US] ET AL) [A] 8 * paragraph [0040] *
by applicantUS3861963
 US4310609
 US4391729
 US5545497
 US5695892
 US6221534
 US6413669
 US6558845
 US6566007
 US6685752
 US6696201
 US6797017
 US5472810
 US5516340
 US8685568
 US5750286
 US5435874
 US5571640
 US5716422
    - TAKEUCHI, E. S.; THIEBOLT, W. C., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1991), vol. 138, pages L44 - L45