Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2942114

EP2942114 - Method for detecting foreign bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumer Inspection GmbH
Lohnerhofstrasse 6
78467 Konstanz / DE
[2015/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Massen, Robert
Am Rebberg 29
78337 Öhningen / DE
 [2015/46]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2015/46]
Application number, filing date14167730.209.05.2014
[2015/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2942114
Date:11.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2942114
Date:27.02.2019
Language:DE
[2019/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B07C5/342, D01G31/00, G01N21/85, G01N21/89
[2015/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/25]
Former [2015/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Erkennen von Fremdkörpern[2015/46]
English:Method for detecting foreign bodies[2015/46]
French:Procédé de reconnaissance de corps étrangers[2015/46]
Examination procedure11.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/25]
16.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2019Fee for grant paid
17.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
BG27.05.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NL27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.02.2019
LT27.02.2019
NO27.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9714955  (CIS GRAPHIK BILDVERARBEITUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,11,15 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 23 - page 9, line 12 * [I] 2,5-9,12-14;
 [I]US2005078306  (ENGELS GUIDO [DE]) [I] 1-15 * figures 7-10 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] *
ExaminationWO2014206508
by applicantEP0364786
 WO2008058573