blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2830353 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2830353



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 605
23.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.04.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
06.03.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
06.03.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 85
31.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 85
13.10.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.07.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.07.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 21
10.05.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.05.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 169
20.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
20.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
20.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.11.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 5
30.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 2
30.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 10
16.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
22.07.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
09.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
09.05.2014 Description Search / examination 57
09.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 22
09.05.2014 Priority document Search / examination 75
09.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5