Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804177

EP2804177 - Method for processing an audio signal and audio receiving circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel IP Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Yemdji, Christelle
61 Boulevard Wilson
FR-06600 Antibes / FR
02 / Lepauloux, Ludovick
210 Boulevard Leader
FR-06400 Cannes / FR
03 / Beaugeant, Christophe
167 chemin de 2 Vallons
FR-06340 Mouans Sartoux / FR
04 / Evans, Nicholas
288 chemin du Caladou
FR-06560 Valbonne / FR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/43]
Former [2014/47]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14167859.912.05.2014
[2014/47]
Priority number, dateUS20131389242013.05.2013         Original published format: US201313892420
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2804177
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2804177
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804177
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:G10L21/0232, H04R3/02, // G10L21/0216, G10L21/0208, H04B3/23
[2017/21]
Former International [2014/47]G10L21/0232, // G10L21/0216, G10L21/0208
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/46]
Former [2014/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines Audiosignals und Audioempfangsschaltung[2014/47]
English:Method for processing an audio signal and audio receiving circuit[2014/47]
French:Procédé de traitement d'un signal audio et circuit de réception audio[2014/47]
Examination procedure06.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/46]
10.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2017Fee for grant paid
15.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
IE12.05.2018
LU12.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/19]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
IE12.05.2018
LU12.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
LU12.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2011125497  (UNNO TAKAHIRO [US]) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 12] , [0 21] - [0025]; figure 3 *
 [XY]  - CHRISTELLE YEMDJI ET AL, "DUAL CHANNEL ECHO POSTFILTERING FOR HANDS-FREE MOBILE TERMINALS", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON ACOUSTIC SIGNAL ENHANCEMENT 2012, (20120904), ISBN 978-3-80-073451-1, XP055174250 [X] 1-8,11-15 * Sections 2, 3;; figure 3 * [Y] 9,10
ExaminationUS2006250998
 US7359504