Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808980

EP2808980 - Motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.08.2018  [2018/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kang, Dong Woo
108-1203, Hyundai Hillstate Apt.,
Hyeonseok-dong
Mapo-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Young Kwan
203-702, Saetbyeol Hanyang Apt.,
Daran-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14167940.712.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateKR2013006046328.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130060463
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2808980
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2808980
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/27
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Motor[2014/49]
English:Motor[2014/49]
French:Moteur[2014/49]
Examination procedure09.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/08]
16.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/31]
23.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008265706  (NAKAYAMA TAKAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-5,8 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * [I] 7;
 [X]JP2002369425  (NISHISHIBA DENKI KK) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 16] , [0 17]; figures 6, 7; claim 3 *;
 [XI]US5829120  (UCHIDA HIROYUKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,9 * column 6, line 22 - line 24; figure 5B * [I] 7,10;
 [XI]US2011316378  (MATT JEAN-CLAUDE [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 47]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 12;
 [X]EP2538528  (FAURECIA BLOC AVANT [FR]; PHENIX INTERNAT [FR]) [X] 1,2,11,13,15 * paragraph [0042]; figures 3, 5, 6 *;
 [X]US2011121668  (CONDAMIN DOMINIQUE [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,14 * figures 1, 4, 7 *;
 [X]US2010166579  (NOH JONGSANG [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0008]; figures 4, 5 *