Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2808980 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2808980



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 145
26.06.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
23.03.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
13.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
13.10.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
26.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
16.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.01.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.10.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.09.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 6
07.09.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 7
07.09.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
07.09.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.08.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
15.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
12.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
12.05.2014 Description Search / examination 12
12.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 12
12.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5