Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2808980


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.06.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
23.03.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.10.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2017 First examination report
20.01.2017 Change - designated states published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
20.01.2017 Change - request for examination published on  22.02.2017  [2017/08]
17.01.2017 Amendment by applicant
02.09.2016 Publication of search report published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
02.09.2016 Change - classification published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
20.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]