Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2804178 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2804178



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 137
04.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
04.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
27.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.07.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.03.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
25.04.2016 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
19.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
19.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.07.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
29.07.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
29.07.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
14.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
13.05.2014 Description Search / examination 19
13.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 7
13.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5