Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2804178
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
20.08.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
06.07.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
07.04.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
02.12.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.08.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.07.2018 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
29.05.2015 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
20.05.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.11.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
17.10.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |