Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804178

EP2804178 - Reproduction of file series [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Jaewan
C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Cha, Soonhyun
C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date14168019.913.05.2014
[2014/47]
Priority number, dateKR2013005353413.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130053534
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804178
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/10, G11B27/34, // G06F3/048
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wiedergabe von Dateireihen[2014/47]
English:Reproduction of file series[2014/47]
French:Reproduction de série de fichiers[2014/47]
Examination procedure19.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
27.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2003236582  (ZAMIR LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-12 * paragraphs [0106] , [0140] - [0203] * * paragraphs [0237] , [0266] , [0346] * * figure 6 * [A] 4-6,13-15;
 [XI]WO2005106878  (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9-12 * paragraphs [0040] - [0047]; figures 4,5 * [I] 4-6,8,13,15;
 [IA]US2008019240  (ARAKI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-4,6-13,15 * paragraphs [0047] , [0048] , [0076] - [0083] * * paragraphs [0096] - [0107] * * paragraphs [0123] - [0125] * * figures 21, 4-6 * [A] 5,14;
 [XI]US2011296047  (ORR BRIAN [CA]) [X] 1-3,7,9-12 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0050]; figure 4 * [I] 4-6,8,13-15;
 [A]US2009153389  (KERR DUNCAN R [US], et al) [A] 4-6,13-15 * paragraphs [0084] - [0099] *;
 [A]US2006206819  (TSUJI TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,7-12 * paragraphs [0047] , [0082] , [0104] * * figures 6,12,13,15 *