Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810677

EP2810677 - Ergonomic and adjustable respiratory mask assembly with cushion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ResMed Pty Ltd
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU
[2019/28]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive
Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Moore, Rachael Elizabeth
c/o ResMed Limited
1 Elizabeth MacArthur Drive Bella Vista
New South Wales 2153 / AU
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/21]
Former [2014/50]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14168092.623.04.2003
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateAU2002PS0192623.04.2002         Original published format: AU PS192602
US20020377254P03.05.2002         Original published format: US 377254 P
US20020397195P22.07.2002         Original published format: US 397195 P
US20020402509P12.08.2002         Original published format: US 402509 P
US2003039068219.03.2003         Original published format: US 390682
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2810677
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2810677
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810677
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06, A61M16/08, A62B18/08
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/03]
Former [2014/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ergonomische und anpassbare Atemmaskenanordnung mit Polster[2014/50]
English:Ergonomic and adjustable respiratory mask assembly with cushion[2014/50]
French:Ensemble de masque respiratoire ergonomique et réglable avec coussin[2014/50]
Examination procedure10.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/03]
17.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2019Fee for grant paid
18.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03252554.5  / EP1356841
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
11.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES22.05.2019
FI22.05.2019
[2019/47]
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP1266674  (WEINMANN G GERAETE MED [DE]) [XP] 1-5,19 * figures 13,14 *;
 [A]US4907584  (MCGINNIS GERALD E [US]) [A] 1-10,19 * figure 4 *;
 [A]WO0020072  (RESPIRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-10,19 * figure 10 *;
 [A]WO0078381  (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [A] 11-18 * page 7, paragraph l; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5937851  (SEROWSKI ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 11-18 * figure - *;
 [A]WO9700092  (APOTHEUS LAB LTD [US]) [A] 14-18 * page 24, paragraph l - page 25, paragraph 1; figure 8 *
by applicantUS4944310
 US5245995
 US5704345
 WO9812965
 WO9961088
 US6119693
 US3990727
 US5243971
 US6357441
 US6112746
 US5724965
 US6119694
 WO0069521
 WO0078384
 US6412487
 US20000482718
 US20000504220
 US20000594775
 US20000502745
 US19980021541
 US20020402509
 US20000504234