Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2772535

EP2772535 - ABC5 positive mesenchymal stem cells as immunomodulators [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Children's Medical Center Corporation
300 Longwood Avenue
Boston, MA 02115 / US
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Frank, Markus, H
9 Brewer Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Gill, Siân Victoria , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Cowley, Catherine Mary , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14168199.931.05.2007
[2014/36]
Priority number, dateUS20060809407P31.05.2006         Original published format: US 809407 P
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2772535
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/077, C12N5/074, A61K35/00
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Positive mesenchymale ABC5-Stammzellen als Immunmodulatoren[2014/36]
English:ABC5 positive mesenchymal stem cells as immunomodulators[2014/36]
French:Cellules souches mésenchymateuses positives ABC5 comme immunomodulateurs[2014/36]
Examination procedure13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
22.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07795647.2  / EP2035549
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.11.2018Request for further processing filed
13.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.11.2018Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
13.05.2015Request for further processing filed
13.05.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.07.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
13.05.2015Request for further processing filed
13.05.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.07.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
13.05.2015Request for further processing filed
13.05.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.07.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[IP]  - KIM S ET AL, "Identification of human ABCB5(+) dermal progenitor cells with multipotent differentiation plasticity", THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20100401), vol. 130, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0022-202X, page S107, XP009170489 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [IPA]  - MEIER BARBARA ET AL, "Progressive Decrease in Number and Change in Niche Preference of the ABCB5(+) Mesenchymal Stem Cell Subset in the Skin during Aging", THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20100901), vol. 130, no. Suppl. 2, ISSN 0022-202X, page S88, XP009170488 [IP] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 10-14
 [AD]  - FRANK NATASHA Y ET AL, "Regulation of progenitor cell fusion by ABCB5 P-glycoprotein, a novel human ATP-binding cassette transporter", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20031121), vol. 278, no. 47, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 47156 - 47165, XP002439831 [AD] 1-14 * page 47156 - page 47157 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M308700200
 [AD]  - FRANK NATASHA Y ET AL, "ABCB5-mediated doxorubicin transport and chemoresistance in human malignant melanoma", CANCER RESEARCH, (200505), vol. 65, no. 10, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4320 - 4333, XP002456050 [AD] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-3327
 [A]  - SHI CHUN-MENG ET AL, "Transplantation of dermal multipotent cells promotes the hematopoietic recovery in sublethally irradiated rats", JOURNAL OF RADIATION RESEARCH, (200403), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0449-3060, pages 19 - 24, XP009091330 [A] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1269/jrr.45.19
 [A]  - JORGENSEN C ET AL, "Engineering mesenchymal stem cells for immunotherapy", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, (200305), vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 928 - 931, XP002973491 [A] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3302019
 [AD]  - FRANK M H ET AL, "Immunomodulatory functions of mesenchymal stem cells", LANCET THE, LANCET LIMITED. LONDON, GB, (20040501), vol. 363, no. 9419, ISSN 0140-6736, pages 1411 - 1412, XP004778099 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(04)16134-5
 [A]  - YOUNG HENRY E ET AL, "Adult-derived stem cells and their potential for use in tissue repair and molecular medicine", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (200507), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 1582-1838, pages 753 - 769, XP009091345 [A] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1582-4934.2005.tb00510.x
 [A]  - FRANK NATASHA ET AL, "ABCB5 P-glycoprotein is a molecular marker of the Hoechst 33342 side population phenotype among human fetal skeletal muscle cells", FASEB JOURNAL, & FASEB MEETING ON EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY: TRANSLATING THE GENOME; WASHINGTON, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, USA; APRIL 17-21, 2004, (2004), vol. 18, no. 4-5, ISSN 0892-6638, XP009091322 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6846883
 US4352883
    - FRANK ET AL., LANCET, (2004), vol. 363, page 1411
    - LE BLANC ET AL., SCAND. J IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 57, page 11
    - RASMUSSON ET AL., EXP. CELL RES., (2005), vol. 305, page 33
    - FRANK, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, page 47156
    - FRANK ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, page 4320
    - FRANK ET AL., CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 4320 - 4333
    - FRANK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 47156 - 47165
    - BARTHOLOMEW ET AL., EXP. HEMATOL., (2002), vol. 30, page 42
    - FERNANDES ET AL., NAT. CELL BIOL., (2004), vol. 6, page 1082
    - SHIH ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2005), vol. 23, page 1012
    - ROTHSTEIN ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (2003), vol. 196, page 85
    - CARTER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 32, page 634
    - FREEMAN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 192, page 1027
    - ITO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 174, page 6648
    - AUGELLO ET AL., EUR. J IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 35, page 1482
    - HIRSCHI KK; GOODELL MA, GENE THER., (2002), vol. 9, pages 648 - 652
    - PITTENGER MF, SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 143 - 147
    - SCHWARTZ RE ET AL., JCLIN INVEST., (2002), vol. 109, pages 1291 - 1302
    - HIRSCHI K; GOODELL M., DIFFERENTIATION, (2001), vol. 68, pages 186 - 192
    - JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (20030715), vol. 112, no. 2, pages 160 - 169
    - JOURNAL OF CELL TRANSPLANTATION, (2003), vol. 12, pages 201 - 213
    - ROJAS; MAURICIO ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY CELL AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (20050512), vol. 33, pages 145 - 152
    - GOODELL MA; JACKSON KA; MAJKA SM; MI T; WANG H; POCIUS J; HARTLEY CJ; MAJESKY MW; ENTMAN ML; MICHAEL LH, "Stem cell plasticity in muscle, and bone marrow", ANN NY ACAD SCI., (200106), vol. 938, pages 208 - 18
    - NATURE MEDICINE JOURNAL, (200309), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 1195 - 1201
    - ZAMOYSKA R, CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 82 - 87
    - VAN PARIJS L ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 280, no. 5361, pages 243 - 248
    - SCHWARTZ RH, CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 351 - 357
    - IMMUNOL REV, (1993), vol. 133, pages 151 - 76
    - SCHARFMANN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 4626 - 4630
    - LAI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10006 - 10010
    - VAN PARIJ S ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1996), vol. 4, pages 321 - 328
    - GREEN; WARE, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1997), vol. 94, no. 12, pages 5986 - 90
    - G. PAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 815 - 818
    - PRASAD ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1997), vol. 94, pages 6346 - 6351
    - FRANK, CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, page 4320
    - YAMADA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, page 140
    - OZKAYNAK ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 169, page 6546
    - KISHIMOTO ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2000), vol. 106, page 63
    - AUGELLO ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 35, page 1482