Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789606

EP2789606 - Modulators of CFTR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
50 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Hadida Ruah, Sara
2356 Torrey Pines 16
La Jolla, 92037 / US
02 / Grootenhuis, Peter D.J.
4801 Riding Ridge Road
San Diego, 92130 / US
03 / Zhou, Jinglan
466 Shorepointe Way
San Diego, 92130 / US
04 / Bear, Brian
7010 Sitio Corazon
Carlsbad, California 92009 / US
05 / Miller, Mark
5075 La Jolla Blvd., 9
San Diego, 92109 / US
06 / McCartney, Jason
1428 Kings Cross Drive
Cardiff by the Sea, California 92007 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Oates, Edward Christopher , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/45]
Former [2014/44]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date14168373.009.05.2008
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateUS20070928334P09.05.2007         Original published format: US 928334 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789606
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789606
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D401/04, C07D405/14, A61K31/444, A61P11/00, A61P37/00
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2014/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modulatoren von CFTR[2014/42]
English:Modulators of CFTR[2014/42]
French:Modulateurs de CFTR[2014/42]
Examination procedure14.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/21]
13.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2017Fee for grant paid
05.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08769357.8  / EP2164840
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU09.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/17]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU09.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/42]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2005075435  (VERTEX PHARMA [US]; HADIDA RUAH SARAH S [US]; GROOTENHUIS PETER D J [U) [A] 1-21 * see compounds of claim 1 and pharmacological activity, i.a. for example compound 299 on p. 108 *;
 [XPAI]WO2007056341  (VERTEX PHARMA [US]; HADIDA RUAH SARA [US]; HAMILTON MATTHEW [US]; MILL) [XP] 1,3-7,9,20,21 * see compounds of claims 7, 8, 21 (p. 190 last residue in first row), 25 and 30 wherein R1 is heteroaryl, defined as pyridyl on p. 15 and wherein R4 is phenyl as defined in claim 30 (first two residue 8th residue and 19th residue on p. 193), the compounds of claims 36 and 60 and their pharmacological activity, especially compounds 6, 12, and 63 * [A] 2,8,10-14 [I] 15-21
by applicantUS2006074075
 US6099562
 US5886026
 US5304121
    - GREGORY, R. J. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 347, pages 382 - 386
    - RICH, D. P. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 347, pages 358 - 362
    - RIORDAN, J. R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 245, pages 1066 - 1073
    - CUTTING, G. R. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 366 - 369
    - DEAN, M. ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 61, pages 863 - 870
    - KEREM, B-S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 245, pages 1073 - 1080
    - KEREM, B-S ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8447 - 8451
    - QUINTON, P. M., FASEB J., (1990), vol. 4, pages 2709 - 2727
    - DALEMANS ET AL., NATURE LOND., (1991), vol. 354, pages 526 - 528
    - PASYK; FOSKETT, J. CELL. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 12347 - 50
    - ARIDOR M ET AL., NATURE MED., (1999), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 745 - 751
    - SHASTRY, B.S. ET AL., NEUROCHEM. INTERNATIONAL, (2003), vol. 43, pages 1 - 7
    - RUTISHAUSER, J. ET AL., SWISS MED WKLY, (2002), vol. 132, pages 211 - 222
    - MORELLO, JP ET AL., TIPS, (2000), vol. 21, pages 466 - 469
    - BROSS P. ET AL., HUMAN MUT., (1999), vol. 14, pages 186 - 198
    - HWANG, T. C. ET AL., J. GEN. PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 111, no. 3, pages 477 - 90
    - DAVID R. LIDE, Handbook of Chemistry and Physics, 75 th Ed., CRC PRESS
    - FREIREICH ET AL., CANCEL CHEMOTHER. REP., (1966), vol. 50, page 219
    - Scientific Tables, Geigy Pharmaceuticals, ARDSLEY, (1970), page 537
    - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - J. SWARBRICK AND J. C. BOYLAN, Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology (1988-1999), MARCEL DEKKER
    - GONZALEZ, J. E.; R. Y. TSIEN, "Voltage sensing by fluorescence resonance energy transfer in single cells", BIOPHYS J, (1995), vol. 69, no. 4, pages 1272 - 80, XP000961694
    - GONZALEZ, J. E.; R. Y. TSIEN, "Improved indicators of cell membrane potential that use fluorescence resonance energy transfer", CHEM BIOL, (1997), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3, pages 269 - 77, XP000961796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3
    - GONZALEZ, J. E.; K. OADES ET AL., "Cell-based assays and instrumentation for screening ion-channel targets", DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (1999), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5, pages 431 - 439, XP001026838

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5
    - GONZALEZ, J. E.; R. Y. TSIEN, "Improvcd indicators of cell membrane potential that use fluorescence resonance energy transfer", CHEM BIOL, (1997), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3, pages 269 - 77, XP000961796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3