blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2789606 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2789606



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1458
19.09.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
22.11.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
19.10.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.10.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.10.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 11
05.10.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 10
05.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 221
26.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 221
08.05.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
05.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.04.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.01.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.01.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 221
02.01.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 221
24.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 35
24.10.2016 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 22
24.10.2016 Description Search / examination 35
24.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 11
14.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 15
14.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
14.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
06.10.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
25.09.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.09.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
18.09.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
17.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
17.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
30.07.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 18
14.05.2014 Description Search / examination 209
14.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
09.12.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 104