blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2789606


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
04.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.02.2019  [2019/06]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
21.09.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
13.10.2017 (Expected) grant published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
09.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.10.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.04.2017 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.01.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.03.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.11.2015 First examination report
16.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
17.04.2015 Change - request for examination published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
14.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
10.10.2014 Change - inventor published on  12.11.2014  [2014/46]
03.10.2014 Change - representative published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
26.09.2014 Change - representative published on  29.10.2014  [2014/44]
12.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
20.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid