Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811091

EP2811091 - Outside door handle for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Strasse 17
42551 Velbert / DE
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Beck, Andreas
Eppendorfer Feld 14
44795 Bochum / DE
02 / Aslan, Aytac
Friedrich-Ebert-Str. 17
42331 Velbert / DE
03 / Kittel, Thomas
Benderstr. 11
42555 Velbert / DE
04 / Fromme, Alexander
Hügelstr. 116
42553 Velbert / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
[2017/01]
Former [2014/50]Zenz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date14168388.815.05.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateDE20131010578805.06.2013         Original published format: DE102013105788
[2014/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2811091
Date:10.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2811091
Date:09.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811091
Date:04.01.2017
Language:DE
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:E05B81/76, // E05B85/16
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/22]
Former [2014/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kraftfahrzeug-Türaußengriff[2014/50]
English:Outside door handle for a motor vehicle[2014/50]
French:Poignée extérieure de porte de véhicule automobile[2014/50]
Examination procedure22.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/22]
28.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2016Fee for grant paid
22.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MT04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE15.05.2017
LU15.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE15.05.2017
LU15.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
IE15.05.2017
LU15.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/17]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU15.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
IT04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/40]ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102007024594  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102004019627  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO2009112310  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 EP2252753  [ ] (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP1284335  (VALEO SICUREZZA ABITACOLO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0120108  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102007011080  (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2252753