blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2811091 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2811091



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 110
08.11.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.11.2016 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
22.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.11.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
22.11.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
22.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.09.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.09.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.09.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
28.09.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 14
19.08.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
06.05.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
14.03.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.02.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 1
09.02.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
09.02.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
10.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
10.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
13.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
23.05.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.05.2014 Priority document Search / examination 15
15.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 Description Search / examination 10
15.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4