blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2811091


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
23.03.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
05.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
10.11.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
02.12.2016 (Expected) grant published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
25.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.09.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.08.2016 Change - classification published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
29.04.2016 Change - designated states published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
29.04.2016 Change - request for examination published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
24.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.02.2016 Publication of search report published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 Change - classification published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
09.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]