blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2811091 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410240401 EP14168388



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104234550BGlobal Dossier 10.10.2017B
CN104234550 24.12.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102013105788 05.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2811091Global Dossier 04.01.2017B1
EP2811091 09.03.2016A3
EP2811091 10.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
DE102013105788 05.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102013105788 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013105788 05.06.2013