Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804191

EP2804191 - Electronic device including a cone of light [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 30.05.2018  [2018/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hager Security
Rue du Pré de l'Orme
38920 Crolles / FR
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Dromard, Jean-Claude
461 rue de l'Etraz de Vent
38530 CHAPAREILLAN / FR
02 / Buiret-Montagny, Jean-Luc
46 rue Paul Langevin
38400 SAINT MARTIN D'HERES / FR
03 / Giry, Franck
1423 La Roche St Alban
73370 LE BOURGET DU LAC / FR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Nuss, Laurent , et al
Cabinet Nuss
10, rue Jacques Kablé
67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date14168484.515.05.2014
[2014/47]
Priority number, dateFR2013005446117.05.2013         Original published format: FR 1354461
[2014/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804191
Date:19.11.2014
Language:FR
[2014/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01H13/02, // G08B5/36
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtung, die einen Lichtkegel umfasst[2014/47]
English:Electronic device including a cone of light[2014/47]
French:Dispositif électronique comprenant un cône de lumière[2014/47]
Examination procedure19.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
08.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/22]
11.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
09.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/22]
09.01.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH0774811  (SONY CORP) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 8;
 [X]US4924044  (TAKAHASHI YOSHIYA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6 * figure 3 * * column 1, lines 40-55 * * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 20 *;
 [X]US4088855  (EMERY WILLIAM BOYD) [X] 1 * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]JP2007329091  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0051] * * figure 6 *;
 [A]JP2007287437  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO; SAMY KK) [A] 8 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]WO2012137876  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]; HIGASHIHAMA HIROTADA; AKAHORI YASUHIRO) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantJPH0774811
 US4924044
 US4088865