blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2793420


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.04.2019 (Expected) grant published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.04.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.04.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
08.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
03.10.2014 Publication of search report published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Change - classification published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Change - classification published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
21.05.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid