blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2793420 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180008919 CN201410272666 EP11150251 EP14168644



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9763251Global Dossier 12.09.2017B2
US2016057757 25.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201314011436 27.08.2013
US201514930095 02.11.2015
US98662011 07.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9179453Global Dossier 03.11.2015B2
US2013343334 26.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201314011436 27.08.2013
US98662011 07.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8873362Global Dossier 28.10.2014B2
US2011164489 07.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
US98662011 07.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101789345BGlobal Dossier 23.10.2017B1
KR20120113773 15.10.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2011KR00082 06.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2013515427Global Dossier 02.05.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2011KR00082 06.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104009832BGlobal Dossier 25.08.2017B
CN104009832 27.08.2014A
Priority number Date
US29300310 07.01.2010
CN201180008919 06.01.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102754373BGlobal Dossier 25.11.2015B
CN102754373 24.10.2012A
Priority number Date
WO2011KR00082 06.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2853266Global Dossier 30.01.2018C
CA2853266 14.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
CA2785914 06.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2785914Global Dossier 28.06.2016C
CA2785914 14.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
WO2011KR00082 06.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2793420Global Dossier 29.05.2019B1
EP2793420 05.11.2014A3
EP2793420 22.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
EP11150251 05.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011204121B 27.03.2014B2
AU2011204121 05.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2011KR00082 06.01.2011
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014202717B 28.01.2016B2
AU2014202717 12.06.2014A1
Priority number Date
AU2014202717 19.05.2014
US29300310 07.01.2010
AU2011204121 06.01.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011083986Global Dossier 08.12.2011A3
WO2011083986 14.07.2011A2
Priority number Date
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6517710BGlobal Dossier 22.05.2019B2
JP2016136733 28.07.2016A
Priority number Date
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2343849Global Dossier 29.05.2019B1
EP2343849 11.03.2015A3
EP2343849 13.07.2011A2
Priority number Date
US29300310 07.01.2010
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2343849