Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793420

EP2793420 - User equipment, base station, and method for enhancing features of uplink reference signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2019/22]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Papasakellariou, Aris
C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Cho, Joon-Young
C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 129 Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date14168644.405.01.2011
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateUS20100293003P07.01.2010         Original published format: US 293003 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2793420
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2793420
Date:05.11.2014
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2793420
Date:29.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L27/26
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:Benutzergerät, Basisstation und Verfahren zur Erweiterung der Merkmale von Uplink-Referenzsignalen[2014/43]
English:User equipment, base station, and method for enhancing features of uplink reference signals[2014/43]
French:Équipement utilisateur, station de base et procédé permettant d'améliorer les caractéristiques des signaux de référence de liaison montante[2014/43]
Examination procedure16.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
06.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2019Fee for grant paid
16.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11150251.4  / EP2343849
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
23.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2479901  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1-17 * paragraphs [0013] , [0048] , [0049] , [0056] , [0073] , [0074] , [0106] , [0107] * * paragraphs [0111] , [0112] , [0134] , [0135] , [0164] , [0165] , [0178] * * tables 4,6,10 *;
 [XP]EP2214335  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [XP] 1,2,8,9,15 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0111] * * figures 8-11 *;
 [A]EP2068477  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 11-15 *;
 [A]EP2026521  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 5,7 *;
 [A]  - NAKAO S ET AL, "Performance Enhancement of E-UTRA Uplink Control Channel in Fast Fading Environments", 2009 IEEE 69TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE; APRIL 26-29, 2009, BARCELONA, SPAIN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090426), ISBN 978-1-4244-2517-4, pages 1 - 5, XP031474732 [A] 1-17 * sections II-IV *