Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2767539

EP2767539 - Pseudopolymorphic forms of a HIV protease inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.01.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
04.07.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Sciences Ireland Unlimited Company
Barnahely
Ringaskiddy
Co Cork / IE
[2019/09]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
Janssen Sciences Ireland UC
Eastgate Village, Eastgate
Little Island, County Cork / IE
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
Janssen R&D Ireland
Eastgate Village
Eastgate, Little Island, County Cork / IE
Inventor(s)01 / Vermeersch, Hans Wim Pieter
Ottergemsesteenweg 158
B-9000 Gent / BE
02 / Thone, Daniel Joseph Christiaan
Bareelstraat 13
B-2340 Beerse / BE
03 / Janssens, Luc Donné Marie-Louise
Sint Laurentiuslaan 36
B-2390 Malle / BE
04 / Wigerinck, Piet Bert Paul
Kardinaal Cardijnstraat 29
B-2840 Terhagen / BE
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/28]
Former [2014/34]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14168686.516.05.2003
[2014/34]
Priority number, dateEP2002007692916.05.2002         Original published format: EP 02076929
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2767539
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2767539
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D493/04, C07D307/06
[2014/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/34]
Extension statesAL16.05.2014
LT16.05.2014
LV16.05.2014
MK16.05.2014
TitleGerman:Pseudopolymorphe Formen eines HIV-Proteaseinhibitors[2014/34]
English:Pseudopolymorphic forms of a HIV protease inhibitor[2014/34]
French:Formes pseudopolymorphiques d'un inhibiteur de la protéase du VIH[2014/34]
Examination procedure16.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
19.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.11.2016Fee for grant paid
15.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03753571.3  / EP1567529
Divisional application(s)EP16158480.0  / EP3045460
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.04.2018  17.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Cooke, Richard
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2018  17.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Cooke, Richard
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2018/21]
Opponent(s)01  12.04.2018  17.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Cooke, Richard
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.04.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.09.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.07.2019Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
16.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
23.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201513   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO9506030  (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [YD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [YD]WO9967417  (US HEALTH [US], et al) [YD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - GRUNENBERG A ET AL, "THEORETICAL DERIVATION AND PRACTICAL APPLICATION OF ENERGY/TEMPERATURE DIAGRAMS AS AN INSTRUMENT IN PREFORMULATION STUDIES OF POLYMORPHIC DRUG SUBSTANCES", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960308), vol. 129, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 147 - 158, XP000909867 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(95)04283-0
 [Y]  - GIRON ET AL, "Thermal analysis and calorimetric methods in the characterisation of polymorphs and solvates", THERMOCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), vol. 248, ISSN 0040-6031, pages 1 - 59, XP002101808 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6031(94)01953-E
 [Y]  - BORKA L ET AL, "Crystal polymorphism of pharmaceuticals", ACTA PHARMACEUTICA JUGOSLAVICA, SAVEZ FARMACEUTSKIH DRUSTAVA JUGOSLAVIJE, ZAGREB, YU, (1990), vol. 40, ISSN 0001-6667, pages 71 - 94, XP002195530 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [YD]  - GHOSH A K ET AL, "Potent HIV protease inhibitors incorporating high-affinity P2-ligands and (R)-(hydroxyethylamino)sulfonamide isostere", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19980317), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 687 - 690, XP004136945 [YD] 1-17 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00098-5
 [Y]  - GHOSH A K ET AL, "Nonpeptidal P2 Ligands for HIV protease Inhibitores: Structure-Based Design Synthesis and Biological Evaluation", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19960816), vol. 39, doi:10.1021/JM960128K, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3278 - 3290, XP002193358 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * * see p.3281, Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960128k
 [Y]  - BYRN S R ET AL, Solid-State Chemistry of Drugs, SOLID-STATE CHEMISTRY OF DRUGS, SSCI INC, WEST LAFAYETTE, PAGE(S) 82 - 85, (19990110), ISBN 978-0-9670671-0-0, XP002588305 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0715618
 WO9967417
 US6248775
    - BIOORGANIC AND CHEMIST LETTERS, (1998), vol. 8, pages 687 - 690
OppositionWO9506030
 WO9967417
 WO03106461
 US6248775
    - GRUNENBERG A. et al., "Theoretical derivation and practical application of energy/temperature diagrams as an instrument in preformulation studies of polymorphic drug substances", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (19960308), vol. 129, pages 147 - 158, XP000909867

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(95)04283-0
    - GIRON et al., "Thermal analysis and calorimetric methods in the characterisation of polymorphs and solvates", Thermochimica acta, (19950000), vol. 248, pages 1 - 59, XP002101808

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6031(94)01953-E
    - BORKA L et al., "Crystal polymorphism of pharmaceuticals", Acta Pharmaceutica, (19900000), vol. 40, pages 71 - 94, XP009031944
    - GHOSH A K et al., "Potent HIV protease inhibitors incorporating high-affinity P2-ligands and (R)-(hydroxyethylamino) sulfonamide isostere", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, vol. 8, no. 6, pages 687 - 690, XP004136945

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00098-5
    - GHOSH A K et al., "Nonpeptidal P2 Ligands for HIV protease Inhibitors: Structure-Based Design Synthesis and Biological Evaluation", Journal Of Medicinal Chemistry, vol. 39, pages 3278 - 3290, XP002193358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960128k
    - BYRN S R et al., "Solid-State Chemistry of Drugs", Solid-State Chemistry Of Drugs, vol. 12, pages 82 - 85, XP002588305
    - Aulton, Pharmaceutics: The Science of Dosage Form Design, (20020000), pages 144 - 146 , 239