EP2947034 - An elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2016/36] |
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehtinen, Hannu KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Lampinen, Riku KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Anttila, Markku KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
Ciuculescu, Gabriel KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
Salmi, Markus KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 06 /
Puranen, Mikko KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/40] | 01 /
Lehtinen, Hannu KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | ||
02 /
Lampinen, Riku KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | |||
03 /
Anttila, Markku KONE Corpration Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | |||
04 /
Ciuculescu, Gabriel KONE Corpration Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | |||
05 /
Salmi, Markus KONE Corpration Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | |||
06 /
Puranen, Mikko KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | |||
Former [2015/48] | 01 /
Lehtinen, Hannu KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | ||
02 /
Lampinen, Riku KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | |||
03 /
Anttila, Markku Topintie 1 08700 Lohja / FI | |||
04 /
Ciuculescu, Gabriela Suvantopolku 1 F 71 01600 Vantaa / FI | |||
05 /
Salmi, Markus Haltiantie 4 R 127 01600 Vantaa / FI | |||
06 /
Puranen, Mikko KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 14168760.8 | 19.05.2014 | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947034 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2947034 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B7/12 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
B66B7/1215 (EP,US);
B66B7/06 (CN);
B66B5/00 (CN);
B66B5/0031 (US);
B66B5/022 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | Aufzug | [2015/48] | English: | An elevator | [2015/48] | French: | Ascenseur | [2015/48] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2014 | AL | 05.10.2016 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | IT | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | RS | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | IE | 19.05.2017 | LU | 19.05.2017 | MT | 19.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.05.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
TR | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
MT | 19.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.05.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
MT | 19.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 19.05.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
MT | 19.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.05.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
MT | 19.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
MT | 19.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
IE | 19.05.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
IT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004256180 (EICHHORN ROLAND [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2396264 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0068]; figure 8 *; | [A]EP2574583 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * |