Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815941

EP2815941 - Vehicle driving device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Tamaru, Daisuke
c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA;
Intellectual Property Department
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date14168780.619.05.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateJP2013011112227.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013111122
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815941
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60W30/09, B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W10/184, B60T7/22, B60W30/18, F16D48/06
[2018/47]
Former International [2014/52]B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W10/184, B60W30/09, // B60T7/22, F02D41/12, F02M69/28, F16D48/06, F02D9/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugantriebsvorrichtung[2014/52]
English:Vehicle driving device[2014/52]
French:Dispositif de conduite de véhicule[2014/52]
Examination procedure26.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
08.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE102010003677  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0014] * * claims 1,3,5,7 * [Y] 2-7 [I] 7;
 [XY]FR2796601  (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,5,7 * page 1, lines 1-4 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 8 * * page 5, lines 3-5 * * claims 1-6,9-11 * * figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 2-4,6,7;
 [XY]DE102004031305  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] , [0022] - [0026] * * claim 6 * * figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 2-7;
 [Y]US5889476  (SCHMITZ GUENTER [DE]) [Y] 3-6 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 26 *;
 [Y]DE102011102330  (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0012] - [0028] , [0040] - [0046] - [0053] - [0057] - [0062] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [IPY]US2013218433  (MATSUNO KOUJI [JP]) [IP] 1,3,4,7 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0008] , [0016] - [0018] * [Y] 3,4
by applicantJPH11321389
 JP2006168629
 JP2012192776