Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815994

EP2815994 - Insertion device for flat articles, in particular insertion device for inserts and method for withdrawing flat goods from a stack [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BÖWE SYSTEC GmbH
Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 1
86159 Augsburg / DE
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Höpner, Bernd
Alpenstraße 21
86159 Augsburg / DE
02 / Celeste, Ronald
Truchseßstr. 9
86707 Kühlenthal / DE
03 / Hölzle, Florian
Oberschönenfelderstr. 9b
86199 Augsburg / DE
04 / Schempp, Harald
August-Vetter-Str. 39
86157 Augsburg / DE
05 / Michel, Bernd
Köhlerberg 38
86456 Lützelburg / DE
06 / Hauke, Stephan
Josef-Priller-Str. 20A
86159 Augsburg / DE
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Charrier Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Fuggerstrasse 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Charrier, Rapp & Liebau
Patentanwälte Fuggerstrasse 20
86150 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date14168781.419.05.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateDE20131010648621.06.2013         Original published format: DE102013106486
[2014/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815994
Date:24.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815994
Date:29.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65H3/04, B65H3/52, B65H3/56
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:Anleger für flache Güter, insbesondere Beilagenanleger, und Verfahren zum Abziehen flacher Güter aus einem Stapel[2014/52]
English:Insertion device for flat articles, in particular insertion device for inserts and method for withdrawing flat goods from a stack[2014/52]
French:Margeur pour marchandises plates, notamment margeur de documents, et procédé d'extraction de marchandises plates d'une pile[2014/52]
Examination procedure28.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
17.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2015Fee for grant paid
19.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.05.2014
AL29.07.2015
BG29.07.2015
CY29.07.2015
CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MK29.07.2015
MT29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
TR29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU19.05.2014
BG29.07.2015
CY29.07.2015
CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MK29.07.2015
MT29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
TR29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2018/38]HU19.05.2014
BG29.07.2015
CY29.07.2015
CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MK29.07.2015
MT29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2018/32]HU19.05.2014
CY29.07.2015
CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MK29.07.2015
MT29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2018/30]HU19.05.2014
CY29.07.2015
CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MK29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2018/29]HU19.05.2014
CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
MC29.07.2015
MK29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
SM29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/21]DK29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/20]DK29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/14]ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RS29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT29.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[XAI]JP2001002265  (CANON APTEX INC) [X] 1,4,10,15 * abstract * [A] 3,5,7-9,12,14 [I] 2,6,11,13;
 [XI]JPH04101938  (RICOH KK) [X] 1,4,10,15 * abstract * [I] 1,2,11,13;
 [A]JPS6026538  (CANON KK) [A] 1,15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011236113  (UEYAMA NAOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2548826
 EP0813496
 EP1591388
 US2003080490
 US2005082744
 US7722028