Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805899

EP2805899 - Transport chain & transport chain system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carryline AB
Box 543
442 15 Kungälv / SE
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Henrekson, Dag
Trankärr 220
442 49 Kungälv / SE
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date14168787.119.05.2014
[2014/48]
Priority number, dateSE2013005063424.05.2013         Original published format: SE 1350634
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805899
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805899
Date:13.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65G17/38
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Transportkette und Transportkettensystem[2014/48]
English:Transport chain & transport chain system[2014/48]
French:Chaîne de transport et système de chaîne de transport[2014/48]
Examination procedure04.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
06.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2015Fee for grant paid
10.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)14.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.05.2014
AL13.01.2016
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.05.2016
LU19.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU19.05.2014
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
TR13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.05.2016
LU19.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/32]HU19.05.2014
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.05.2016
LU19.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/30]HU19.05.2014
AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CY13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
MC13.01.2016
MK13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.05.2016
LU19.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
Former [2017/26]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
IE19.05.2016
LU19.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SI13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
BG13.04.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
LU19.05.2016
Former [2017/04]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
LU19.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT13.01.2016
BE13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT13.01.2016
CZ13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RO13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
SK13.01.2016
SM13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
EE13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT13.01.2016
DK13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
LV13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
RS13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
IS13.05.2016
PT13.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT13.01.2016
ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
IT13.01.2016
LT13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
PL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/35]ES13.01.2016
FI13.01.2016
HR13.01.2016
NL13.01.2016
NO13.04.2016
GR14.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL13.01.2016
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1235000  (MICRO MECHATRONIC TECHNOLOGIES [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,9,11,12,15,16 * paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,1a,2 * [Y] 6 [I] 13;
 [Y]WO9915443  (FLEXLINK SYSTEMS AB [SE]; ALSTMAR AAKE [SE]) [Y] 6 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB736274  (BASIL GEORGE TOLLEY) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3768631  (RAGNVALD E) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4597492
 US6364094
 SE511811