Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816839

EP2816839 - Geographically-organized neighbor cell lists [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SM
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Eearnshaw, Andrew Mark
61 Allenby Road
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2J8 / CA
02 / Hole, David P.
13 Launcelyn Close
North Baddesley
Southampton, Hampshire SO52 9NP / GB
03 / McCann, Stephen
9 Phillips Close
Rownhams
Southampton, Hampshire SO16 8LT / GB
04 / Wijayanathan, Maiyuran
539 Wood Netttle Way
Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2X9 / CA
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2018/35]
Former [2014/52]Fennell, Gareth Charles , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14168852.319.05.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateUS20131392108118.06.2013         Original published format: US201313921081
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2816839
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2816839
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816839
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00, // H04W36/36, H04W36/08
[2018/14]
Former International [2014/52]H04W36/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Geografisch organisierte Nachbarzellenlisten[2014/52]
English:Geographically-organized neighbor cell lists[2014/52]
French:Listes de cellules voisines géographiquement organisées[2014/52]
Examination procedure02.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/42]
02.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2018Fee for grant paid
19.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018