Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805639

EP2805639 - Reel based lacing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boa Technology, Inc.
445 Anglers Drive, Suite 2A
Steamboat Springs, CO 80487 / US
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Soderberg, Mark
26796 Light Lane
Conifer, CO 80433 / US
02 / Nickel, Michael Joseph
29201 Upper Moss Rock Road
Golden, CO 80401 / US
03 / Cavanagh, Sean
2006 Ford Street
Golden, CO 80401 / US
04 / Goodman, James Paul
24614 Palermo Way
Valencia, CA 91355 / US
 [2018/16]
Former [2014/48]01 / Soderberg, Mark
26796 Light Lane
CO, 80433 Conifer / US
02 / Nickel, Michael Joseph
29201 Upper Moss Rock Road
CO, 80401 Golden / US
03 / Cavanagh, Sean
2006 Ford Street
CO, 80401 Golden / US
04 / Goodman, James Paul
24614 Palermo Way
CA, 91355 Valencia / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/16]
Former [2014/48]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14168875.420.11.2009
[2014/48]
Priority number, dateUS20080116905P21.11.2008         Original published format: US 116905 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805639
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805639
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A43C11/16, A41F1/06, A41F9/02, A42B1/22, A42B3/14, A45C13/10, A45F3/00, A45F3/04, A45F3/16, A63C10/06, A61F5/01, B65H75/44, A43C1/06, A43C11/00, B65H75/30
[2017/43]
Former International [2014/48]A43C11/16, A41F9/02, A42B1/22, A42B3/14, A41F1/06, A45C13/10, A45F3/00, A45F3/04, A45F3/16, A63C10/06, A61F5/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schnürsystem auf Spulenbasis[2014/48]
English:Reel based lacing system[2014/48]
French:Système de laçage à enrouleur[2014/48]
Examination procedure19.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
06.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2018Fee for grant paid
05.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09760413.6  / EP2378911
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.01.2019   
GI. DI. MECCANICA S.p.A.
Via Toniolo 29
31028 Vazzola (TV) / IT
Opponent's representative
Gonella, Mario, et al
Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna, 35
33170 Pordenone / IT
 [2019/09]
30.01.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.06.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
LU20.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/34]AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
LU20.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0651954  (ATTREZZATURE MECCANISMI MINUTE [IT]) [X] 1-13 * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 56; figure - *;
 [X]US2006156517  (HAMMERSLAG GARY R [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19945045  (BURKHART UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG [CH]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]IT1220811  (SIGNORI DINO SIDI SPORT [IT]) [X] 1-13 * pages 9-11; figure -; claims 1, 7 *;
 [X]WO0115559  (BOA TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * pages 10-14; figure - *
by applicantUS2006156517
 US2007169378
OppositionEP0651954
 US2006156517
 DE19945045
 IT1220811
 WO0115559
 US5042177
 EP0297342
 EP0056953
 EP0132744
    - anonymous, "Ski Boot Collection 90-91", Nordica catalog, (19900200), pages 6 - 11, XP055551713
    - Anonymous, "Four Buckle Drive", SKIING magazine, (19891100), XP055551718
    - Fits like a glove skis like hell, "Anonymous", SKI magazine, (19891200), XP055551723