Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805910

EP2805910 - Working machine and control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.03.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J.C. Bamford Excavators Ltd.
Lakeside Works
Rocester
Uttoxeter Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Brooks, Graham Mark
c/o JCB Loadall Engineering
Lakeside Works
Rocester
Uttoxeter, Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB
02 / Brooks, Richard
c/o JCB Loadall Engineering
Lakeside Works
Rocester
Uttoxeter, Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB
03 / Bell, Samuel Josef
c/o JCB Loadall Engineering
Lakeside Works
Rocester
Uttoxeter, Staffordshire ST14 5JP / GB
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Foot, Paul Matthew James
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
Greater London SE1 2AU / GB
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date14168908.319.05.2014
[2014/48]
Priority number, dateGB2013000902320.05.2013         Original published format: GB 201309023
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805910
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B66F9/065, E02F3/34, E02F9/22, E02F3/40
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Arbeitsmaschine und Steuerungssystem[2014/48]
English:Working machine and control system[2014/48]
French:Machine de travail et système de commande[2014/48]
Examination procedure16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5287699  (TAKAMURA FUJITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 7,12;
 [XI]US7117952  (BARES MARK F [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 7,12;
 [XI]US2006248885  (BUCKMIER JASON M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 7,12;
 [XI]JPH08165678  (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 7,12;
 [I]GB1187527  (SALZGITTER MASCHINEN AG [DE]) [I] 1,13,14 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US7270046  (STEPHENSON DWIGHT B [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * the whole document *