blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2805910 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2805910



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 173
06.06.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 32
31.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2019 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
31.05.2019 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 8
31.05.2019 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 15
16.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
16.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
09.10.2014 European search report Search / examination 4
02.10.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
25.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Priority document Search / examination 34
19.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.05.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
19.05.2014 Description Search / examination 16
19.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
19.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5