blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2805910


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.06.2019 New entry: Observations by third parties
14.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2015 Change - designated states published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
20.03.2015 Change - request for examination published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
17.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
25.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]