blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2805910 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410213655 EP14168908



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10145085Global Dossier 04.12.2018B2
US2017016207 19.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201414279103 15.05.2014
US201615282103 30.09.2016
GB201309023 20.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9556589Global Dossier 31.01.2017B2
US2014343804 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
GB201309023 20.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2014227828Global Dossier 08.12.2014A
Priority number Date
GB201309023 20.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104179217BGlobal Dossier 17.05.2019B
CN104179217 03.12.2014A
Priority number Date
GB201309023 20.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2805910Global Dossier 26.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
GB201309023 20.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU2014202689B 15.03.2018B2
AU2014202689 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
GB201309023 20.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2514346 08.02.2017B
GB2514346 26.11.2014A
GB201309023D 03.07.2013D0
Priority number Date
GB201309023 20.05.2013