Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810732

EP2810732 - Arc welding apparatus, arc welding system, and arc welding method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/50]ARC welding apparatus, ARC welding system, and ARC welding method
[2016/37]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Murakami, Masafumi
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / Sakamoto, Taichi
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI
2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2017/07]
Former [2014/50]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14169664.123.05.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateJP2013012073407.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013120734
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2810732
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2810732
Date:02.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810732
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/095, B23K9/10, B23K9/12
[2015/36]
Former International [2014/50]B23K9/095
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/14]
Former [2014/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lichtbogenschweißvorrichtung, Lichtbogenschweißsystem und Lichtbogenschweißverfahren[2014/50]
English:Arc welding apparatus, arc welding system, and arc welding method[2016/37]
French:Appareil, système et procédé de soudage à l'arc[2014/50]
Former [2014/50]ARC welding apparatus, ARC welding system, and ARC welding method
Examination procedure01.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/14]
06.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2016Fee for grant paid
29.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.11.2017   
Fronius International GmbH
Froniusstrasse 1
4643 Pettenbach / AT
Opponent's representative
Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
 [2017/51]
14.12.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.04.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
IE23.05.2017
LU23.05.2017
MT23.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB23.05.2018
[2019/21]
Former [2018/43]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
IE23.05.2017
LU23.05.2017
MT23.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/39]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
IE23.05.2017
LU23.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/29]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
IE23.05.2017
LU23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
FR31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/23]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
IE23.05.2017
LU23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/17]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU23.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/06]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
SM15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT15.02.2017
ES15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RS15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US4717807  (PARKS JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 8, line 35 - column 14, line 48; figures 4-8 *
by applicantJP2011098375
OppositionUS4717807
 WO03101658
 JP2011098375
 EP2335857
 US2012097656
 EP1607162
 EP2272615
 US2009026188
 US2012223063
 WO9946078
 US2012074114