Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813793

EP2813793 - Heat exchanger and outdoor unit for air-conditioner having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.07.2017  [2017/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Hong Suk
10/3, 51-17
Junggok 2-dong
Gwangjin-gu
Republic of Korea
Seoul / KR
02 / Kal, Seung Hoon
206-404, Hyundai HomeTown Apt., Gwiin-dong
Dongan-gu, , Gyeonggi-do, Republic of Korea
Anyang-si / KR
03 / Kwon, Myong Jong
6302-2201, Gwanggyo Raemian Apt., Iui-dong
Yeongtong-gu, Gyeonggi-do, Republic of Korea
Suwon-si / KR
04 / Oh, Seung Jin
402, 153-4, Seokchon-dong, Songpa-gu
Republic of Korea
Seoul / KR
05 / Jang, Choong Hyo
301, Mechanical Engineering, Korea Advanced
Institute of Science, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon, Republic of Korea
Daejeon / KR
06 / Choi, Yong Hwa
344-602, Sibeom Daeun Maeul World Meridian
Bando Yubora Apt., Bansong-dong, Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do, Republic of Korea
Hwaseong-si / KR
07 / Gaku, Hayase
2314, Panteon Regency, Jeongja-dong,
Bundang-gu, Gyeonggi-do, Republic of Korea
Seongnam-si / JP
08 / Hong, Sung Hun
908-101, 901-905, Prun Maeul Posco Thesharp
Apt.,Neung-dong, Gyeonggi-do, Republic of Korea
Hwaseong-si / KR
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Waddington, Richard
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date14169726.823.05.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateKR2013006803513.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130068035
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813793
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:F28F17/00, F25B39/02, F28D1/047, F28F1/32, F24F13/22
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wärmetauscher und Außeneinheit für Klimaanlage damit[2014/51]
English:Heat exchanger and outdoor unit for air-conditioner having the same[2014/51]
French:Échangeur thermique et unité extérieure pour climatiseur en disposant[2014/51]
Examination procedure11.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
15.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2007192513  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,7,9-15 * abstract * [I] 3-6,8;
 [A]JP2011185589  (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [A] 1-15 * abstract *