Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790241

EP2790241 - Organic electro luminescence display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2015/40]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
95, Samsung 2 Ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do, 446-711 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Iee-Gon
c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575, Shin-dong
Yeongtong-gu, Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
02 / Kim, Tae-Hyung
c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., 575, Shin-dong
Yeongtong-gu, Gyeonggi-do
Suwon-si / KR
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14169766.429.11.2004
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateKR2003008779729.11.2003         Original published format: KR 20030087797
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790241
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/32, H01L51/50, G09G3/32
[2019/42]
Former International [2014/42]H01L51/50, H01L27/32, G09G3/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2015/22]
Former [2014/42]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:Organoelektronische Elektrolumineszenzanzeigevorrichtung[2014/42]
English:Organic electro luminescence display[2014/42]
French:Dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent organique[2014/42]
Examination procedure15.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
27.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
09.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04090475.7  / EP1536495
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
26.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
28.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[IAY]EP0935229  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0029]; figures 2-3 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 2,3;
 [YA]US6011531  (MEI PING [US], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document * * figures 2,10,12-23 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP0293048  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US5977562  (HIRAKATA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * figures 14,15,18,20 *;
 [A]US2003085340  (STREET ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 4,5 *;
 [Y]JP2003229616  (CANON KK) [Y] 3 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP1331666  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0064]; figure 1B *
by applicantKR20020077241
 EP0935229
 US6011531
 EP0293048
 US5977562
 US2002021268