Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808630

EP2808630 - Airtight container for refrigerator and refrigerator including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/22]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Ahreum
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
153-802 Seoul / KR
02 / Lee, Sanggyun
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
153-802 Seoul / KR
03 / Park, Yongjoo
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
153-802 Seoul / KR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2019/34]
Former [2014/49]Urner, Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date14169997.527.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateKR2013006055328.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130060553
KR2013006055428.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130060554
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2808630
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2808630
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808630
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F25D25/02
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/49]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Luftdichter Behälter für einen Kühlschrank und Kühlschrank damit[2014/49]
English:Airtight container for refrigerator and refrigerator including the same[2014/49]
French:Récipient hermétique pour réfrigérateur et réfrigérateur le comportant[2014/49]
Examination procedure22.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/49]
04.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2019Fee for grant paid
09.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6090422  (TARAGAN ARIE [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,15 * figures 1,5,6 * [I] 8,10-14;
 [XI]KR19990033606  (N.N.) [X] 1-7,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 8-13;
 [X]US5271240  (DETRICK ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,15 * figures 5-7 *;
 [X]WO2012010505  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,15 * figures 1-8 *