Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808557

EP2808557 - Structure assembly for a turbomachine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG
Eschenweg 11
15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Dr. Gümmer, Volker
Max-Planck-Straße 12B
15831 Mahlow / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Müller, Wolfram Hubertus , et al
Patentanwälte
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date14170060.927.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateDE20131021016831.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013210168
[2014/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808557
Date:03.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/52, F04D29/68, // F04D29/54
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Strukturbaugruppe für eine Strömungsmaschine[2014/49]
English:Structure assembly for a turbomachine[2014/49]
French:Ensemble structurel pour une turbomachine[2014/49]
Examination procedure02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
07.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19647605  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10,15 * the whole document * * column 2, lines 17-36 * * figure 2 *;
 [XI]EP1659293  (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1-11,13,15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] - [0034] * * figures 5,7a-7g * [I] 14;
 [XI]DE10105456  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,10,13,15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] * * figures 1, 1a * [I] 7,8;
 [XD]EP0497574  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [XD] 1-6,8,13-15 * the whole document * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 8 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [XI]EP0751280  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,15 * the whole document * * column 3, lines 26-57 * * page 5, lines 8-22 * * figures 2,4,6 * [I] 14;
 [XD]EP2108784  (ROLLS ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [XD] 1,4,5,8,9,11,12,15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] * * figures 4,6,7 *
by applicantEP0754864
 DE10135003
 EP0497574
 US2005226717
 US6585479
 DE10330084
 US8152445
 DE102008037154