Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808372

EP2808372 - Surface treatment compositions comprising photochromic dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
02 / Patterson, Steven George
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
03 / Moon, Andrew Philip
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Belgium UK
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date14170307.428.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateEP2013016956828.05.2013         Original published format: EP 13169568
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808372
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:C09K9/02, C11D3/40, A61Q11/02, D06P1/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Oberflächenbehandlungszusammensetzungen mit fotochromen Farbstoffen[2014/49]
English:Surface treatment compositions comprising photochromic dyes[2014/49]
French:Compositions de traitement de surface comprenant des colorants photochromes[2014/49]
Examination procedure02.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
12.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.09.2019Request for further processing filed
24.09.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.10.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
12.08.2015Request for further processing filed
12.08.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.08.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6196241  (DOOLAN DENISE [US]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-21 * [I] 8;
 [XI]WO2007093303  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]; LEVER HINDUSTAN LTD [IN]; BATCHEL) [X] 1-5,14,15 * claims 1-15 * [I] 6-13;
 [XI]WO2005123023  (SEGAN IND INC [US]; RIBI HANS O [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-31 * [I] 6-13;
 [XI]US5221288  (KAMADA KAZUMASA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,14 * claims 1-40 * [I] 3-13,15;
 [XI]US2006172135  (AGRAWAL SATISH [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [I] 3-15
by applicantUS5576282
 US6306812
 US6326348
 US2008034511
 US8268016
 US7208459
 WO2011098355
 US2012225803
 US2012090102
 US7686892
 WO2010142503
 WO2008087497
 WO2011011799
 US2012129752
 US8138222
 US7909890
 US2008305982
 US2009247449
 WO9108281
 WO9001815
 US6312936
 US5679630
 US4760025
 US7262042
 WO2009021867
 WO8906270
 WO2005052161
 WO2005052146
 WO2007044993
 US5352604
 US7153818
 WO9700324
 EP1022334
 WO9402597
 WO9418314
 WO9623874
 WO9743424
 US5856164
 WO9923211
 WO9623873
 WO0060060
 WO2006002643
 US6093562
 WO2009149130
 US6939702
 US2009217464
 US7141403
 WO9817767
 WO2012000846
 WO2008015443
 WO2008014965
 US2007173430
 US4430243
 US5597936
 US5595967
 WO2005042532
 WO0032601
 US6225464
 US7445644
 US7585376
 US2009176684
 WO2012004134
 US4790856
 US3646015
 BE680847
 US2006205631
 US2005203213
 US7294611
 US6855680
 WO2010034736
 US3962418
 US3958581
 US2007207109
 USRE34584E
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US4152416
 US2826551
 US3964500
 US4364837
 US6607717
 US6482969
 US5807956
 US5981681
 US6207782
 US7465439
 US7041767
 US7217777
 US2007286837
 US2005048549
 US2007041929
 GB849433
 DE10036533
 US5674478
 US5750122
 US4529586
 US4507280
 US4663158
 US4197865
 US4217914
 US4381919
 US4422853
 WO2009043709
 US4489455
 US4489574
 US2954347
 US4265779
 US3455839
 US3933672
 US4652392
 US4978471
 US4983316
 US5288431
 US4639489
 US4749740
 US4798679
 US4075118
 EP0150872
 DE2124526
 WO2011163457
 US4990280
 US2003087791
 US2003087790
 US2005003983
 US2004048764
 US4762636
 US6291412
 US2005227891
 EP1070115
 US5879584
 US5691297
 US5574005
 US5569645
 US5565422
 US5516448
 US5489392
 US5486212
 EP2133410
 US6166117
 US6787512
 WO2010084039
 WO2007039042
 WO2010022775
 WO2009132870
 WO2009087033
 WO2007006357
 WO2007096052
 WO2011020991
 WO2006053598
 WO03018740
 WO03018738
 US6020303
 US6060443
    - S.N. CORNS ET AL., COLORATION TECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 125, pages 249 - 261
    - S.M.R. BILLAH ET AL., COLORATION TECHNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 128, pages 488 - 492
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, 2d ed.,, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1989), vol. 15, pages 204 - 308
    - KIRK OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Third Edition,, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1979), vol. 7, pages 430 - 447
    - POUCHER, JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF COSMETIC CHEMISTS, (1995), vol. 6, no. 2, page 80
 EP19890307851
 EP20080101442