Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809073

EP2809073 - Bit-Rate control for video coding using object-of-interest data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.06.2018  [2018/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Peng, Ya-Ti
2164 Esperanca Ave
Santa Clara, CA California 95054 / US
02 / Chiu, Yi-jen
1043 Oaktree Drive
San Jose, CA California 95129 / US
03 / Jiang, Hong
1058 Penniman Drive
El Dorado Hills, CA California 95762 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14170365.228.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateUS20131390603130.05.2013         Original published format: US201313906031
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809073
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/117, H04N19/167, H04N19/176, H04N19/124
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bitraten-Steuerung zur Videocodierung mit interessierenden Objektdaten[2014/49]
English:Bit-Rate control for video coding using object-of-interest data[2014/49]
French:Commande de débit binaire pour codage vidéo utilisant des données d'objet d'intérêt[2014/49]
Examination procedure03.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
09.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2018
06.02.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
09.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/26]
19.02.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011276652  (MUKHERJEE UDDIPAN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0058] - [0060] - [0 75] , [0 93] - [0100] *;
 [XA]US6801665  (ATSUMI EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10,14,15 * column 18, line 60 - column 19, line 7 * * column 24, line 14 - column 25, line 16 * [A] 2-9,11-13;
 [A]US2004228535  (HONDA YOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0055] - [0077]; figures 4A, 4B *;
 [A]US6256423  (KRISHNAMURTHY RAVI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 45; figure 1 *
by applicantWO2010CN00997