Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784162

EP2784162 - Engineering of systems, methods and optimized guide compositions for sequence manipulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Change - applicantpublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Broad Institute, Inc.
415 Main Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138-3876 / US
[2019/13]
Former [2015/52]For all designated states
The Broad Institute, Inc.
415 Main Street
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02142-1324 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138-3876 / US
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
The Broad Institute, Inc.
7 Cambridge Center
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02142-1324 / US
For all designated states
President and Fellows of Harvard College
17 Quincy Street
Cambridge, MA 02138-3876 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cong, Le
100 Memorial DR
Apt 8 - 21B
Cambridge, MA 02142 / US
02 / Zhang, Feng
100 Pacific Street
Apt. 11
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / Hsu, Patrick
37 Kirkland Street
Apt. B1
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
04 / Ran, Fei
30 Clarendon St
Boston, MA 02116 / US
 [2015/43]
Former [2014/40]01 / Cong, Le
1200 Massachusetts Ave.
Apt. 33E
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
02 / Zhang, Feng
100 Pacific Street
Apt. 11
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / Hsu, Patrick
37 Kirkland Street
Apt. B1
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
04 / Ran, Fei
129 St. Botolph St.
Apt. 2
Boston, MA 02115 / US
Representative(s)De Clercq, Ann G. Y.
De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Williams, Gareth Owen
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
Application number, filing date14170383.512.12.2013
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateUS201261736527P12.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261736527 P
US201361748427P02.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361748427 P
US201361758468P30.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361758468 P
US201361769046P25.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361769046 P
US201361791409P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361791409 P
US201361802174P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361802174 P
US201361806375P28.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361806375 P
US201361814263P20.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361814263 P
US201361819803P06.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361819803 P
US201361828130P28.05.2013         Original published format: US 201361828130 P
US201361835931P17.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361835931 P
US201361836127P17.06.2013         Original published format: US 201361836127 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784162
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784162
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/63
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:Konstruktion von Systemen, Verfahren und optimierte Führungszusammensetzungen zur Sequenzmanipulation[2014/40]
English:Engineering of systems, methods and optimized guide compositions for sequence manipulation[2014/40]
French:Ingénierie de systèmes, procédés et compositions de guidage optimisé pour manipulation de séquence[2014/40]
Examination procedure28.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
11.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2015Fee for grant paid
24.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13818570.7  / EP2771468
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin, et al
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Marlow International
Parkway
Marlow SL7 1YL / GB
 07  08.01.2016  05.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2019/11]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin, et al
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  05.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
Former [2018/42]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Nikolaistrasse 15
80802 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  05.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
Former [2018/41]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  05.09.2018  WITHDRAWN
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
Former [2018/35]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  23.07.2018  WITHDRAWN
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  19.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
Former [2018/18]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  19.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
10A Printing House Yard
Hackney Road
London E2 7PR / GB
Former [2018/11]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Baarerstrasse 14
6300 Zug / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  19.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
Aldgate Tower
2 Leman Street
London E1 8FA / GB
Former [2017/32]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  19.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
Aldgate Tower
2 Leman Street
London E1 8FA / GB
Former [2017/12]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group
Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  19.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Patent Boutique LLP
Aldgate Tower
2 Leman Street
London E1 8FA / GB
Former [2016/27]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Bezzubova, Olga
Jones Day
Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016  19.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016  18.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  08.01.2016  21.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
 06  08.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016   
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 08  08.01.2016  26.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
Former [2016/07]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
 02  07.01.2016   
CRISPR Therapeutics AG
Aeschenvorstadt 36
4051 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  08.01.2016   
Schlich, George
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George, et al
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 04  08.01.2016   
Storz, Dr. Ulrich
c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 05  08.01.2016   
Regimbeau
20, Rue de Chazalles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Opponent's representative
Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
 06  08.01.2016   
Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP
19-21 Chapel Street
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB
Opponent's representative
Teuten, Andrew John
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
 07  08.01.2016   
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
 08  08.01.2016   
Boxall IPM Limited
Homefield
133 Woodnesborough Road
Sandwich
Kent CT13 0BA / GB
Opponent's representative
Boxall, Sarah Jane
Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street
Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2015  05.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Grund, Dr., Martin
Nikolaistr. 15
80802 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Grund, Martin
Grund
Intellectual Property Group
Postfach 44 05 16
80754 München / DE
18.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.02.2019Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.12.2013
AL08.04.2015
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU12.12.2013
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SM08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
Former [2017/39]HU12.12.2013
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
Former [2016/33]HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
Former [2016/24]HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
Former [2016/10]HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
Former [2015/49]HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
RS08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010076057  (SONTHEIMER ERIK J [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * example 2; claims 1-20 *;
 [Y]  - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740 [Y] 1-19 * Whole Document;; figures S1, S7, S8, S11 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
 [Y]  - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity (Supplementary Material)", SCIENCE, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067747 [Y] 1-19 * figures S7, S8, S11; table S1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
 [Y]  - G. GASIUNAS ET AL, "PNAS Plus: Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20120925), vol. 109, no. 39, doi:10.1073/pnas.1208507109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588 [Y] 1-19 * page E2579; figures 4, S9 * * page E2579 * * page E2583 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
 [XP]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055102030 [XP] 1-19 * the whole document * * page 820, column l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [XP]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067744 [XP] 1-19 * figures S1, S8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [AP]  - JIANG WENYAN ET AL, "RNA-guided editing of bacterial genomes using CRISPR-Cas systems", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY,, (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 233 - 239, XP002699849 [AP] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2508
 [A]  - BLAKE WIEDENHEFT ET AL, "RNA-guided genetic silencing systems in bacteria and archaea", NATURE, (20120215), vol. 482, no. 7385, doi:10.1038/nature10886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 331 - 338, XP055116249 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10886
 [A]  - ELITZA DELTCHEVA ET AL, "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, doi:10.1038/nature09886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
 [A]  - MICHAEL P TERNS ET AL, "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems", CURRENT OPINION IN MICROBIOLOGY, (20110601), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005, ISSN 1369-5274, pages 321 - 327, XP055097823 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005
 [XP]  - GAJ THOMAS ET AL, "ZFN, TALEN, and CRISPR/Cas-based methods for genome engineering", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130701), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2013.04.004, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 397 - 405, XP028571313 [XP] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004
 [XP]  - WANG HAOYI ET AL, "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", CELL, (20130509), vol. 153, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2013.04.025, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358 [XP] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
 [XP]  - LUKE A. GILBERT ET AL, "CRISPR-Mediated Modular RNA-Guided Regulation of Transcription in Eukaryotes", CELL, (20130701), vol. 154, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 442 - 451, XP055115843 [XP] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044
 [XP]  - KRZYSZTOF CHYLINSKI ET AL, "The tracrRNA and Cas9 families of type II CRISPR-Cas immunity systems", RNA BIOLOGY, (20130501), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.4161/rna.24321, ISSN 1547-6286, pages 726 - 737, XP055116068 [XP] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/rna.24321
 [XP]  - WOONG Y HWANG ET AL, "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:10.1038/nbt.2501, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625 [XP] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
by applicantUS4873316
 EP0264166
 US2011059502
 US5049386
 US4946787
 US4897355
 WO9117424
 WO9116024
 US4186183
 US4217344
 US4235871
 US4261975
 US4485054
 US4501728
 US4774085
 US4837028
 US4797368
 WO9324641
 US5173414
 US2003087817
 US6603061
 US7868149
 US2009100536
    - GOEDDEL, GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185
    - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 521 - 530
    - MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 466 - 472
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1981), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1527 - 31
    - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC.
    - SMITH; JOHNSON, GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40
    - AMRANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315
    - STUDIER ET AL., GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89
    - BALDARI ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 229 - 234
    - KUIJAN; HERSKOWITZ, CELL, (1982), vol. 30, pages 933 - 943
    - SCHULTZ ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 54, pages 113 - 123
    - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 2156 - 2165
    - LUCKLOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39
    - SEED, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, page 840
    - KAUFINAN ET AL., EMBO ., vol. 6, pages 187 - 195
    - PINKERT ET AL., GENES DEV., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 277
    - CALAME; EATON, ADV. IMMUNO ., (1988), vol. 43, pages 235 - 275
    - WINOTO; BALTIMORE, EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, pages 729 - 733
    - BANEIJI ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 729 - 740
    - QUEEN; BALTIMORE, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 741 - 748
    - BYME; RUDDLE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5473 - 5477
    - EDLUND ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 912 - 916
    - KESSEL; GRUSS, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 374 - 379
    - CAMPES; TILGHMAN, GENES DEV., (1989), vol. 3, pages 537 - 546
    - ISHINO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 5429 - 5433
    - NAKATA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 3553 - 3556
    - GROENEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 10, pages 1057 - 1065
    - HOE ET AL., EMERG. INFECT. DIS., (1999), vol. 5, pages 254 - 263
    - MASEPOHL ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1996), vol. 1307, pages 26 - 30
    - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 17, pages 85 - 93
    - JANSSEN ET AL., OMICS J. INTEG. BIOL., (2002), vol. 6, pages 23 - 33
    - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 36, pages 244 - 246
    - VAN EMBDEN ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, pages 2393 - 2401
    - JANSEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 43, pages 1565 - 1575
    - ZUKER; STIEGLER, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, pages 133 - 148
    - A.R. GRUBER ET AL., CELL, (2008), vol. 106, no. 1, pages 23 - 24
    - PA CARR; GM CHURCH, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1151 - 62
    - ANDERSON, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813
    - NABEL; FELGNER, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 211 - 217
    - MITANI; CASKEY, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 162 - 166
    - DILLON, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 167 - 175
    - MILLER, NATURE, (1992), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460
    - VAN BRUNT, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1149 - 1154
    - VIGNE, RESTORATIVE NEUROLOGY AND NEUROSCIENCE, (1995), vol. 8, pages 35 - 36
    - KREMER; PERRICAUDET, BRITISH MEDICAL BULLETIN, (1995), vol. 51, no. L, pages 31 - 44
    - YU ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 13 - 26
    - CRYSTAL, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 404 - 410
    - BLAESE ET AL., CANCER GENE THER., (1995), vol. 2, pages 291 - 297
    - BEHR ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 382 - 389
    - REMY ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 647 - 654
    - GAO ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 710 - 722
    - AHMAD ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 4817 - 4820
    - BUCHSCHER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 2731 - 2739
    - JOHANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 1635 - 1640
    - SOMMNERFELT ET AL., VIROL., (1990), vol. 176, pages 58 - 59
    - WILSON ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 2374 - 2378
    - MILLER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2220 - 2224
    - WEST ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 160, pages 38 - 47
    - KOTIN, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801
    - MUZYCZKA, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 94, page 1351
    - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 3251 - 3260
    - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, pages 2072 - 2081
    - HERMONAT; MUZYCZKA, PNAS, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6466 - 6470
    - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 03822 - 3828
    - MORRELL ET AL., "Crop genomics:advances and applications", NAT REV GENET., (20111229), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 85 - 96
    - MCIVOR EI; POLAK U; NAPIERALA M, RNA BIOL., (201009), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 551 - 8
    - GIULIANO AVANZINI, JEFFREY L. NOEBELS,, Genetics of Epilepsy and Genetic Epilepsies, MARIANI FOUNDATION PAEDIATRIC NEUROLOGY, (2009), page 20
    - TANGRI S ET AL., "Rationally engineered therapeutic proteins with reduced immunogenicity", J IMMUNOL., (20050315), vol. 174, no. 6, pages 3187 - 96
    - URNOV, F.D.; REBAR, E.J.; HOLMES, M.C.; ZHANG, H.S.; GREGORY, P.D., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", NAT. REV. GENET., (2010), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nrg2842, pages 636 - 646, XP008150557

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - BOGDANOVE, A.J.; VOYTAS, D.F., "TAL effectors: customizable proteins for DNA targeting", SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 333, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1204094, pages 1843 - 1846, XP055093385

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1204094
    - STODDARD, B.L, "Homing endonuclease structure and function", Q. REV. BIOPHYS., (2005), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1017/S0033583505004063, pages 49 - 95, XP008065807

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0033583505004063
    - BAE, T.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Allelic replacement in Staphylococcus aureus with inducible counter-selection", PLASMID, (2006), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1016/j.plasmid.2005.05.005, pages 58 - 63, XP024939950

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plasmid.2005.05.005
    - SUNG, C.K.; LI, H.; CLAVERYS, J.P.; MONISON, D.A., "An rpsL cassette, janus, for gene replacement through negative selection in Streptococcus pneumoniae", APPL. ENVIRON. AFICRO OL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 5190 - 5196
    - SHARAN, S.K.; THOMASON, L.C.; KUZNETSOV, S.G.; COURT, D.L., "Recombineering: a homologous recombination-based method of genetic engineering", NAT. PROTOC., (2009), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nprot.2008.227, pages 206 - 223, XP001525689

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2008.227
    - JINEK, M. ET AL., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1225829, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - DEVEAU, H.; GARNEAU, J.E.; MOINEAU, S., "CRISPR-Cas system and its role in phage-bacteria interactions", ANNU. REV. ICROBIOL., (2010), vol. 64, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.micro.112408.134123, pages 475 - 493, XP055067789

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.micro.112408.134123
    - HORVATH, P.; BARRANGOU, R., "CRISPR-Cas, the immune system of bacteria and archaea", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1179555, pages 167 - 170, XP055016971

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1179555
    - TEMS, M.P.; TERNS, R.M., "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems", CURR. OPIN. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005, pages 321 - 327, XP055097823

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005
    - VAN DER OOST, J.; JORE, M.M.; WESTRA, E.R.; LUNDGREN, M.; BROUNS, S.J., "CRISPR-based adaptive and heritable immunity in prokaryotes", TRENDS. BIOCHEM. SCI., (2009), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tibs.2009.05.002, pages 401 - 407, XP002559963

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibs.2009.05.002
    - BROUNS, S.J. ET AL., "Small CRISPR RNAs guide antiviral defense in prokaryotes", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1159689, pages 960 - 964, XP002559962

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1159689
    - CARTE, J.; WANG, R., LI, H.; TERNS, R.M.; TERNS, M.P., "Cas6 is an endoribonuclease that generates guide RNAs for invader defense in prokaryotes", GENES DEV., (2008), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1101/gad.1742908, pages 3489 - 3496, XP055054069

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.1742908
    - DELTCHEVA, E. ET AL., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, (2011), vol. 471, doi:doi:10.1038/nature09886, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
    - HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MANIV, I.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "Mature clustered, regularly interspaced, short palindromic repeats RNA (crRNA) length is measured by a ruler mechanism anchored at the precursor processing site", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2011), vol. 108, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1112832108, pages 21218 - 21222, XP055250498

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1112832108
    - HAURWITZ, R.E.; JINEK, M.; WIEDENHEFT, B.; ZHOU, K.; DOUDNA, J.A., "Sequence- and structure-specific RNA processing by a CRISPR endonuclease", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 329, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1192272, pages 1355 - 1358, XP055244668

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1192272
    - DEVEAU, H. ET AL., "Phage response to CRISPR-encoded resistance in Streptococcus thermophilus", J. BACTERIOL., (2008), vol. 190, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.01412-07, pages 1390 - 1400, XP002679468

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.01412-07
    - MAKAROVA, K.S.; ARAVIND, L.; WOLF, Y.I.; KOONIN, E.V., "Unification of Cas protein families and a simple scenario for the origin and evolution ofCRISPR-Cas systems", BIOL. DIRECT., (2011), vol. 6, page 38
    - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2012), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt.2357, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357
    - BROUNS, S.J., "Molecular biology. A Swiss army knife of immunity", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, pages 808 - 809
    - CARROLL, D., "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", MOL. THER., (2012), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1038/mt.2012.171, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - BIKARD, D.; HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MUCIDA, D.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "CRISPR interference can prevent natural transformation and virulence acquisition during in vivo bacterial infection", CELL HOST MICROBE, (2012), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chom.2012.06.003, pages 177 - 186, XP028934538

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chom.2012.06.003
    - ZAHNER, D.; HAKENBECK, R., "The Streptococcus pneumoniae beta-galactosidase is a surface protein", J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.182.20.5919-5921.2000, pages 5919 - 5921, XP002529681

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.182.20.5919-5921.2000
    - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; DEDENT, A.C.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Sortases and the art of anchoring proteins to the envelopes of gram-positive bacteria", MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (2006), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1128/MMBR.70.1.192-221.2006, pages 192 - 221, XP002459580

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MMBR.70.1.192-221.2006
    - MOTAMEDI, M.R.; SZIGETY, S.K.; ROSENBERG, S.M., "Double-strand-break repair recombination in Escherichia coli: physical evidence for a DNA replication mechanism in vivo", GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 2889 - 2903
    - HOSAKA, T. ET AL., "The novel mutation K87E in ribosomal protein S12 enhances protein synthesis activity during the late growth phase in Escherichia coli.", MOL. GENET. GENOMICS, (2004), vol. 271, pages 317 - 324
    - COSTANTINO, N.; COURT, D.L., "Enhanced levels of lambda Red-mediated recombinants in mismatch repair mutants", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 15748 - 15753
    - EDGAR, R.; QIMRON, U., "The Escherichia coli CRISPR system protects from lambda lysogenization, lysogens, and prophage induction", J. BACTERIOL., (2010), vol. 192, pages 6291 - 6294
    - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; SONTHEIMER, E.J., "Self versus non-self discrimination during CRISPR RNA-directed immunity", NATURE, (2010), vol. 463, doi:doi:10.1038/nature08703, pages 568 - 571, XP055118462

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08703
    - FISCHER, S. ET AL., "An archaeal immune system can detect multiple Protospacer Adjacent Motifs (PAMs) to target invader DNA", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2012), vol. 287, pages 33351 - 33363
    - GUDBERGSDOTTIR, S. ET AL., "Dynamic properties of the Sulfolobus CRISPR-Cas and CRISPR/Cmr systems when challenged with vector-bome viral and plasmid genes and protospacers", MOL. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 79, pages 35 - 49
    - WANG, H.H. ET AL., "Genome-scale promoter engineering by coselection MAGE", NAT METHODS, (2012), vol. 9, pages 591 - 593
    - HOSKINS, J. ET AL., "Genome of the bacterium Streptococcus pneumoniae strain R6", J. BACTERIOL., (2001), vol. 183, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.183.19.5709-5717.2001, pages 5709 - 5717, XP002231307

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.183.19.5709-5717.2001
    - HAVARSTEIN, L.S.; COOMARASWAMY, G; MORRISON, D.A., "An unmodified heptadecapeptide pheromone induces competence for genetic transformation in Streptococcus pneumoniae.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1995), vol. 92, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.92.24.11140, pages 11140 - 11144, XP000892151

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.24.11140
    - HORINOUCHI, S.; WEISBLUM, B., "Nucleotide sequence and functional map ofpC194, a plasmid that specifies inducible chloramphenicol resistance", J. BACTERIOL., (1982), vol. 150, pages 815 - 825
    - HORTON, R.M., "In Vitro Recombination and Mutagenesis of DNA : SOEing Together Tailor-Made Genes", METHODS MOL. BIOL., (1993), vol. 15, pages 251 - 261
    - PODBIELSKI, A.; SPELLERBERG, B.; WOISCHNIK, M.; POHL, B.; LUTTICKEN, R., "Novel series of plasmid vectors for gene inactivation and expression analysis in group A streptococci (GAS", GENE, (1996), vol. 177, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(96)84178-3, pages 137 - 147, XP004043388

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)84178-3
    - HUSMANN, L.K.; SCOTT, J.R.; LINDAHL, G.; STENBERG, L., "Expression of the Arp protein, a member of the M protein family, is not sufficient to inhibit phagocytosis of Streptococcus pyogenes", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 63, pages 345 - 348
    - GIBSON, D.G. ET AL., "Enzymatic assembly of DNA molecules up to several hundred kilobases", NAT METHODS, (2009), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.1318, pages 343 - 345, XP055224105

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1318
    - TANGRI S ET AL., "Rationally engineered therapeutic proteins with reduced immunogenicity", JIMMUNOL., (20050315), vol. 174, no. 6, pages 3187 - 96
 WO1994US05700
OppositionWO2014093712
 WO2013176772
 WO2014093595
 RO101W
 US2013074611
 US2013074825
 WO2014065596
 WO2014089290
 WO2014093661
 WO2011146121
 EP2571512
 EP2771468
 WO2014099744
 US2013074819
 US4952496
 US2010076057
 US2005220796
    - Evidence of assignment recordal from the United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) register of transfers at Reel 033219/Frame 0097
    - Evidence of assignment recordal from the USPTO register of transfers at Reel 034124/Frame 0526
    - Evidence of assignment recordal from the USPTO register of transfers at Reel 033331/Frame 0578
    - Evidence of assignment recordal from the USPTO register of transfers at Reel 032309/Frame 0575
    - JINEK, M. et al., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity.", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - BROUNS, S., "A Swiss army knife of immunity.", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1227253, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - GASIUNAS, G. et al., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNS cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria.", Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (20120000), pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - Freedom of Information Act
    - NIH RePORTER Project Information
    - Evidence of an official response of a member of the NIH RePORT Support Team to an inquiry as to when the basic data for D5a appeared online in the RePORTER database
    - FISCHER-FANTUZZI, L. et al., "Cell -dependent efficiency of reiterated nuclear signals in a mutant simian virus 40 oncoprotein targeted to the nucleus.", Mol. Cell . Biol., (19880000), vol. 8, pages 5495 - 5503, XP009140368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.8.12.549
    - FIECK, A. et al., "Modifications of the E.coli Lac repressor for expression in eukaryotic cells: effects of nuclear signal sequences on protein activity and nuclear accumulation.", Nucleic Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 1785 - 1791, XP002095852
    - DAI, Y-S. et al., "The transcription factors GATA4 and dHAND physically interact to synergistically activate cardiac gene expression through a p300-dependent mechanism.", J Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 24390 - 24398, XP055251716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202490200
    - PARK, I-H. et al., "Regulation of ribosomal S6 kinase 2 by mammalian target of rapamycin.", J Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 31423 - 31429, XP055251717

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M204080200
    - PLANEY, S. et al., "Inhibition of glucocorticoid-induced apoptosis in 697 pre-B lymphocytes by the mineralocorticoid receptor N-terminal domain.", J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 42188 - 42196, XP055251719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M205085200
    - CAMPEAU, E. et al., "A versatile viral system for expression and depletion of proteins in mammalian cells.", PLoS ONE, (20090000), vol. 4, page e6529, XP055251120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006529
    - URNOV, F. et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases .", Nat. Rev. Gene ., (20100000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nrg2842, pages 636 - 646, XP008150557

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - RADULOVICH, N. et al., "Modified gateway system for double shRNA expression and Cre/lox based gene expression.", BMC Biotech., (20110000), vol. 11, pages 1 - 9, XP055268107

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-11-24
    - HANDEL, E-M. et al., "Versatile and efficient genome editing in human cells by combining zinc-finger nucleases with adeno-associated viral vectors.", Human Gene Ther., (20120000), vol. 23, pages 321 - 329, XP002730956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.140
    - JOUNG, J. et al., "TALENS: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing.", Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20130000), vol. 14, pages 49 - 55, XP055102236

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - MALI, P. et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9 .", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055248658

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - CONG L. et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems.", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055153567

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - JINEK, M. et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells .", eLife, (20130000), vol. 2, page e00471;, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CHO, S. et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease.", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 230 - 232, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - HWANG, W. et al., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR- Cas system.", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - CHANG, N. et al., "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in Zebrafish embryos.", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - SHEN, B. et al., "Generation of gene -modified mice via Cas9/RNA- mediated gene targeting.", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 720 - 723, XP055141533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.46
    - WANG, H. et al., "One-step generation of mice carrying mutations in multiple genes by CRISPR/Cas-mediated genome engineering.", Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GRATZ, S. et al., "Genome engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease.", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 194, pages 1029 - 1035, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - HSU, P. et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nucleases .", Nature Biotech., (20130000), vol. 31, pages 827 - 834, XP055219426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - GUSTAFSSON, G. et al., "Codon bias and heterologous protein expression .", Trends Biotechnol., (20040000), vol. 22, pages 346 - 353, XP004520507

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2004.04.006
    - CHIU, W-I. et al., "Engineered GFP as a vital reporter in plants.", Current Biol., (19960000), vol. 6, pages 325 - 330, XP000942576

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00483-9
    - YU, Z. et al., "Highly efficient genome modifications mediated by CRISPR/Cas 9 in Drosophila.", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, pages 289 - 291, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - SHIEH, M. et al., "Nuclear targeting of the maize R protein requires two nuclear localization sequences.", Plant Physiol., (19930000), vol. 101, pages 353 - 361, XP055241771

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.101.2.353
    - LUO, M. et al., "Multiple nuclear localization sequences allow modulation of 5-lipoxygenase nuclear import.", Traffic, (20040000), vol. 5, pages 847 - 854, XP055267791

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0854.2004.00227.x
    - DO, H-J. et al., "Identification of multiple nuclear localization signals in murine Elf3, an ETS transcription factor.", FEBS Lett., (20060000), vol. 580, pages 1865 - 1871, XP028030315

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2006.02.049
    - RAYMOND, C. et al., "High-efficiency FLP and PHIC31 site-specific recombination in mammalian cells.", PLoS ONE, (20070000), vol. 1, page e162, XP055069998

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162
    - TINLAND, B. et al., "The T-DNA-linked VirD2 protein contains two distinct functional nuclear localization signals.", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 7442 - 7446, XP055254906

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.16.7442
    - Evidence of the named Inventors for each respective priority application P1-P12, as retrieved from the US Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) official online register
    - Evidence of assignment recordal from the named Inventors to the Assignees for each respective priority application P1-P12, as retrieved from the USPTO official online register
    - JINEK et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity'';", Science, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - BROUNS, "A Swiss Army Knife of Immunity'';", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1227253, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - GASIUNAS et al., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA D3 cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria'';", PNAS, (20120000), page e2579, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - PNAS, vol. 109, no. 39, pages 15539 - 40
    - NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF GENERAL MEDICAL SCIENCES, "Freedom of Information Act", NIH research grant
    - NIH RePORTER Project Information for Research Grant No. 1R01 DK 097768-01
    - L. FISCHER-FANTUZZI et al., "Cell -dependent efficiency of reiterated nuclear-signals in a mutant simian virus 40 oncoprotein targeted to the nucleus'';", Mol Cell Biol., (19880000), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 5495 - 5503, XP009140368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.8.12.549
    - FIECK et al., "Modifications of the E. coli Lac repressor for expression in eukaryotic cells: effects of nuclear signal sequences on protein activity and nuclear accumulation'';", Nucleic Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1785 - 1791, XP002095852
    - DAI et al., "The transcription factors GATA4 and dHAND physically interact to synergistically activate cardiac gene expression through a p300-dependent mechanism'';", J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, no. 27, pages 24390 - 8, XP055251716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202490200
    - PARK et al., "Regulation of ribosomal S6 kinase 2 by mammalian target of rapamycin'';", J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, no. 35, pages 31423 - 31429, XP055251717

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M204080200
    - PLANEY et al., "Inhibition of glucocorticoid-induced apoptosis in 697 pre-B lymphocytes by the mineralocorticoid receptor N-terminal domain'';", J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, no. 44, pages 42188 - 96, XP055251719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M205085200
    - CAMPEAU et al., "A versatile viral system for expression and depletion of proteins in mammalian cells'';", PLoS One, (20090806), vol. 4, no. 8, page e6529, XP055251120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006529
    - URNOV et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases'';", Nat Rev. Genet, (20100911), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646, XP055198280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - RADULOVICH et al., "Modified gateway system for double shRNA expression and Cre/lox based gene expression'';", BMC Biotechnol., (20110322), vol. 11, page 24, XP021096706

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-11-24
    - DELTCHEVA et al., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III'';", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, no. 7340, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
    - HÄNDEL et al., "Versatile and efficient genome editing in human cells by combining zinc-finger nucleases with adeno-associated viral vectors", Human Gene Therapy, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 321 - 329;, XP002730956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.140
    - JOUNG et al., "TALENs: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing", Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20130000), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 49 - 55, XP055102236

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - MALI et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9'';", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055153369

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - CONG et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems'';", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055153567

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - JINEK et al., "RNA- programmed genome editing in human cells'';", vol. 2, (20130000), page e00471, URL: http://elifesciences.org/content/2/e00471, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CHO et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA- guided endonuclease'';", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, page 230, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - HWANG et al., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system'';", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - DICARLO et al., "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems'';", Nucleic Acids Res., (20130000), vol. 41, page 4336, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - CHANG et al., "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos'';", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, no. 4, page 465, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - SHEN et al., "Generation of gene -modified mice via Cas9/RNA-mediated gene targeting'';", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 720 - 723, XP055141533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.46
    - CHYLINSKI et al., "The tracrRNA and Cas9 families of type II CRISPR-Cas immunity systems'';", RNA Biol., (20130501), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 726 - 737, XP055116068

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/rna.24321
    - WANG et al., "One-step generation of mice carrying mutations in multiple genes by CRISPR/Cas-mediated genome engineering'';", Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, no. 4, pages 910 - 8, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GAJ et al., "ZFN, TALEN, and CRISPR/Cas-based methods for genome engineering'';", Trends in Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 397 - 405, XP055065263

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004
    - GRATZ et al., "Genome Engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-Guided Cas9 Nuclease'';", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 194, page 1029, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - XIAO et al., "Chromosomal deletions and inversions mediated by TALENs and CRISPR/Cas in zebrafish'';", Nucl. Acid Res., (20130000), vol. 1, no. 14, page e141, XP055098101

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt464
    - GILBERT et al., "CRISPR-mediated modular RNA-guided regulation of transcription in eukaryotes'';", Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, no. 2, pages 442 - 51, XP055167546

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044
    - HSU et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nucleases'';", Nature Biotech, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 834, XP055219426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - GUSTAFSSON et al., "Codon bias and heterologous protein expression", Trends Biotechnol., (20040000), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 346 - 53, XP004520507

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2004.04.006
    - CHIU et al., "Engineered GFP as a vital reporter in plants'';", Current Biology, (19960000), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 325 - 330, XP000942576

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00483-9
    - XIE et al., "RNA-guided genome editing in plants using CRISPR-Cas system'';", Molecular Plant, (20131100), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 1975 - 1983, XP055154141

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/mp/sst119
    - YU et al., "Highly efficient genome modifications mediated by CRISPR/Cas9 in Drosophila", Genetics, (20130900), vol. 95, no. 1, pages 289 - 91, XP055069998

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162
    - SHIEH et al., "Nuclear Targeting of the maize R protein requires two nuclear localization sequences'';", Plant Physiol., (19930000), vol. 101, no. 2, pages 353 - 361, XP055241771

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.101.2.353
    - LUO et al., "Multiple nuclear localization sequences allow modulation of 5- lipoxygenase nuclear import'';", Traffic, (20040000), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 847 - 54, XP055267733

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0854.2004.00227.x
    - DO et al., "Identification of multiple nuclear localization signals in murine EIf3, an ETS transcription factor", FEBS Letters, (20060000), vol. 580, no. 7, pages 1865 - 71, XP028030315

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2006.02.049
    - LANGE et al., "Classical nuclear localization signals: definition, function, and interaction with importin alpha", J. Biol. Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, no. 8, pages 5101 - 5, XP002674492

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1074/JBC.R600026200
    - KOSUGI et al., "Six classes of nuclear localization signals specific to different binding grooves of importin alpha'';", J. Biol. Chem., (20090000), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 478 - 85, XP055267734

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M807017200
    - RAYMOND et al., "High-Efficiency FLP and PHIC31 Site-Specific Recombination in Mammalian Cells'';", PLoS ONE, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 1);, XP055069998

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162
    - LI et al., "Modularly assembled designer TAL effector nucleases for targeted gene knockout and gene replacement in eukaryotes", Nucleic Acids Res., (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 6315 - 25, XP055149646

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1939
    - TINLAND et al., "The T-DNA-linked VirD2 protein contains two distinct functional nuclear localization signals", PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, no. 16, pages 7442 - 6, XP055254906

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.16.7442
    - Assignement of inventor Cong
    - Assignement of inventor Maraffini
    - Assignement of inventor Maraffini PD: 12/12/2012
    - CONG et al., "multiplex genome engineering using crispr/cas systems", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 823, XP055236048

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - JINEK et al., "a programmable dual rna guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - CHANG et al., "genome editing with rna guided CAS9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos", Cell Res., (20130326), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - WANG et al., "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", Cell, (20130502), vol. 153, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - YANG et al., "one step generation of mice carrying reporter and conditional alleles", Cell, (20130829), vol. 154, no. 6, pages 1370 - 1379, XP028716273

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.08.022
    - YU et al., "Highly Efficient Genome Modifications Mediated by CRISPR/Cas9 in Drosophila", Genetics., (20130705), vol. 2013195, no. 1, pages 289 - 291, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - MALI et al., "rna guided human genome engineering via cas9", Science ., (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 823 - 826, XP055153369

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - JINEK et al., "RNA programmed genome editing in human cells", Elife., (20130129), vol. 2, page e00471, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CHO et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease", Nat Biotechnol., (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 230 - 232, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - HWANG et al., "efficient in vivo genome editing using RNA guided nucleases", Nat Biotechnol., (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - GILBERT et al., "CRIPSR mediated modular RNA guided regulation of transcription in eukaryotes", Cell, (20130711), vol. 154, no. 2, pages 442 - 451, XP055167546

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044
    - DICARLO et al., "genome engineering in saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR cas systems", Nucleic Acids Res., (20130304), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 4336 - 4343, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - BASSETT et al., "highly efficient targeted mutagenesisof drosophila with the CRISP", Cell Rep., (20130701), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 220 - 228, XP055237308

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2013.06.020
    - KONDO et al., "highly improved gene targeting by germline specific cas9 expression", Genetics., (20130903), vol. 195, no. 3, pages 715 - 721, XP055248203

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.156737
    - SEBO et al., "A simplified and efficient germline-specific CRISPR/Cas9 system for Drosophila genomic engineering", Fly (Austin)., (20131018), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 52 - 57, XP055267780

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/fly.26828
    - ANDREAS et al., "Enhanced efficiency through nuclear localization signal fusion on phage ϕC31-integrase: activity comparison with Cre and FLPe recombinase in mammalian cells", Nucleic Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, no. 11, pages 2299 - 2306, XP002365902

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/30.11.2299
    - FIECK et al., "Modifications of the E.coli Lac repressor for expression in eukaryotic cells: effects of nuclear signal sequences on protein activity and nuclear accumulation", Nucl Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1785 - 1791, XP002095852
    - FISHER-FANTUZZI et al., "Cell-dependent efficiency of reiterated nuclear signals in a mutant simian virus 40 oncoprotein targeted to the nucleus.", Mol. Cell Biol., (19880000), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 5495 - 5503, XP009140368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.8.12.549
    - AU et al., "Characterization of a baculovirus nuclear localization signal domain in the late expression factor 3 protein", Virology, (20080000), vol. 385, pages 209 - 217, XP025958585

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virol.2008.10.051
    - GREENSAN et al., "Two nuclear location signals in the influenza virus NS1 nonstructural protein.", J. Virol., (19880000), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 3020 - 3026, XP055267785
    - IMAGAWA et al., "two nuclear localization signals are required for nuclear translocation of nuclear factor 1-A", FEBS Lett., (20000000), vol. 484, pages 118 - 124, XP004337724

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(00)02119-0
    - LUO et al., "Multiple Nuclear Localization Sequences Allow Modulation of 5-Lipoxygenase Nuclear Import", Traffic, (20040000), vol. 5, pages 847 - 854, XP055267791

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0854.2004.00227.x
    - MORIN et al., "nuclear localization of the adeno virus DNA binding protein", Mol. Cell Biol., (19890000), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 4372 - 4380, XP055267792

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.9.10.4372
    - NAGARAJAN et al., "A Hierarchy of Nuclear Localization Signals Governs the Import of the Regulatory Factor X Complex Subunits and MHC Class II Expression", J. Immunol., (20040000), vol. 173, no. 1, pages 410 - 419, XP055267795

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.173.1.410
    - CHAN et al., "Characterization of the Kinetochore Binding Domain of CENP-E Reveals Interactions with the Kinetochore Proteins CENP-F and hBUBR1", J. Cell Biol., (19880000), vol. 143, no. 1, pages 49 - 63, XP055267796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/359536a0
    - RODRIGUES et al., "red fluorescent protein (DS red) as a reporter in saccharomyces cerevisiae", J. Bact., (20010000), vol. 183, no. 12, pages 3791 - 3794, XP055267797

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.183.12.3791-3794.2001
    - LOS et al., "halotag technology cell imaging and protein", Cell Notes, (20060000), vol. 14, pages 10 - 14, XP055267799
    - PRIMO et al., "lentiviral vectors for cutaneous RNA managing", Exp Dermatol., (20120000), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 162 - 170, XP055267802

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0625.2011.01436.x
    - YI et al., "current advances in retroviral gene therapy", Curr Gene Ther., (20110000), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 218 - 228, XP055267804

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/156652311795684740
    - SINGER et al., "Applications of Lentiviral Vectors for shRNA Delivery andTransgenesis", Curr. Gene Ther., (20080000), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 483 - 488, XP055182427

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/156652308786848067
    - Printout from Luciano Marraffini's web page
    - MALI et al., "RNA guided human genome engineering via CAS9", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055153369

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - Supplementary material for D6
    - HWANG et al., "efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR cas system", Nature Biotechnology, (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - Supplementary material for D7
    - CARROLL, "a CRISPR approach to gene targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - JINEK et al., "a programmable Dual RNA guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - Supplementary material for D11
    - Alignments showing sequence identity between guide sequences of D11 and eukaryotic sequences
    - JINEK et al., "RNA programmed genome editing in human cells", eLife, (20130129), vol. 2, no. e00471, pages 1 - 9, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - RAYMOND et al., "high efficiency FLP and c31 site specific recombination", PlosOne, (20070000), pages 1 - 4, XP055069998

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162
    - LI et al., "modularly assembled designer TAL effector nucleases for targeted gene knockout and gene replacement", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 6315 - 6325, XP055149646

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1939
    - TINLAND et al., "The T-DNA-linked VirD2 protein contains two distinct functional nuclear localization signals", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 89, pages 7442 - 7446, XP055254906

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.16.7442
    - CONG et al., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055153567

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - Supplementary material for D20
    - NAKAI et al., "PSORT: a program for detecting sorting signals in proteins and predicting their subcellular localization", Trends in Biochemical Sciences, (19990100), vol. 24, pages 34 - 35, XP027392948
    - BAKER, "gene editing at CRISPR speed", Nature Biotechnology, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 309 - 312, XP003035060

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.2863
    - KIANI et al., "cas9 gRNA engineering for genome editing activation and repression", Nature Methods aop, (20150907), XP055254915

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.3580
    - Supplementary material for D26
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of S. pyogenes serotype M1 Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of 5. pyogenes serotype M4 Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of Listeria innocua Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of S. thermophiles Cas9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of Campylobacter jejuni Cas9
    - CHANG et al., "Cell Research", vol. 23, (20130326), pages 465 - 472
    - WANG et al., "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", Cell, vol. 153, (20130502), pages 910 - 8, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j. cell . 2013.04.02 5, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - HSU et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA guided CAS nucleases", Nature Biotechnology, (20130721), vol. 31, pages 827 - 32, XP055219426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - SHEN et al., "generation of gene modified mice via CAS9/RNA mediated gene targeting", Cell Research, (20130402), vol. 23, pages 720 - 723, XP055141533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.46
    - GRATZ et al., "Genome Engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-Guided Cas9 Nuclease", Genetics, (20130524), vol. 194, pages 1029 - 35, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - YU et al., "Highly Efficient Genome Modifications Mediated by CRISPR/Cas9 in Drosophila", Genetics, (20130705), vol. 195, pages 289 - 91, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - LYSSENKO et al., "Cognate putative nuclear localization signal effects strong nuclear localization of a GFP reporter and facilitates gene expression studies in Caenorhabditis elegans", Biotechniques, (20071100), vol. 43, pages 596 - 600, XP055268137

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2144/000112615
    - FISCHER-FANTUZZI et al., "Cell-dependent efficiency of reiterated nuclear signals in a mutant simian virus 40 oncoprotein targeted to the nucleus", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (19881200), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 5495 - 5503, XP009140368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.8.12.549
    - BAIKER et al., "The Immediate-Early 63 Protein of Varicella-Zoster Virus: Analysis of Functional Domains Required for Replication In Vitro and for T-Cell and Skin Tropism in the SCIDhu Model In Vivo", Journal of Virology, (20040000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1181 - 1194, XP055268139

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.3.1181-1194.2004
    - ZOLKIEWSKA, "ADAM proteases: ligand processing and modulation of the Notch pathway", Cell Mol Life Sci, (20080000), vol. 65, no. 13, pages 2056 - 2068, XP019619944
    - JINEK, M. et al., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity.", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - CONG, L. et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR-Cas systems.", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055153567

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - CARR et al., "Genome engineering'';", Nature Biotech., (20091209), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1151 - 1162, XP055284957

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1590
    - JINEK, M. et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells.", eLife, (20130129), vol. 2, page e00471, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CHANG et al., "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos'';", Cell Research, (20130326), vol. 23, no. 4, page 465, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - SHEN et al., "Generation of gene -modified mice via Cas9/RNA-mediated gene targeting'';", Cell Research, (20130402), vol. 23, pages 720 - 723, XP055141533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.46
    - WANG et al., "One-step generation of mice carrying mutations in multiple genes by CRISPR-Cas- mediated genome engineering'';", Cell, (20130502), vol. 153, no. 4, pages 910 - 8, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GRATZ et al., "Genome Engineering of Drosophila with the CRISPR RNA-Guided Cas9 Nuclease'';", Genetics, (20130524), vol. 194, page 1029, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - YU et al., "Highly efficient genome modifications mediated by CRISPR-Cas9 in Drosophila", Genetics, (20130705), vol. 95, no. 1, pages 289 - 91, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - HSU et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA- guided Cas9 nucleases'';", Nature Biotech, (20130721), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 834, XP055219426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - BROUNS, S., "A Swiss army knife of immunity.", Science, (20120817), vol. 337, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1227253, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - CARROLL, D., "A CRISPR approach to gene targeting .", Molecular Therapy, (20120900), vol. 20, no. 9, page 1658, XP055106489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171
    - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage.", Nature Biotech., (20120910), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357
    - ALBERTS, Molecular Biology of the Cell, (20020000), pages 671 - 676
    - GASINIUS, G. et al., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria.", Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (20120904), pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - CHRISTIAN, M. et al., "Targeting DNA double-strand breaks with TAL effector nucleases.", Genetics, (20100726), vol. 186, page 757, XP002632806

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/GENETICS.110.120717
    - MILLER, J. C. et al., "A TALE nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing.", Nat. Biotechnol., (20101222), vol. 29, page 143, XP055077697

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755
    - URNOV, F. et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases.", Nat. Rev. Gene, (20100900), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646, XP055198280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - CARROLL, D., "Progress and prospects: Zinc-finger nucleases as gene therapy agents.", Gene Ther., (20080911), vol. 15, page 1463, XP055041104

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145
    - MALI, P. et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9.", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055153369

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - HWANG, W. et al., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system.", Nature Biotechnology, (20130129), vol. 31, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - CHO, S. et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease.", Nature Biotechnology, (20130129), vol. 31, pages 230 - 232, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - JOUNG, J et al., "TALENS: a widely applicable technology for targeted genome editing.", Nat. Rev. Mol . Cell Biol., (20121121), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1038/nrm3486, pages 49 - 55, XP055282847

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - DICARLO, J. et al., "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems", Nucl Acid Res., (20130304), vol. 41, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkt135, pages 4336 - 4343, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - HICKS et al., "Protein import into the nucleus: an integrated view.", Annu Rev Cell Dev Biol ., (19950000), vol. 11, pages 155 - 88
    - ROBERTS, B., "Nuclear location signal-mediated protein transport.", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA)- Gene Structure and Expression, (19890000), vol. 1008, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-4781(89)90016-X, pages 263 - 280 ., XP023576585

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4781(89)90016-X
    - GARCIA-BUSTOS et al., "Nuclear protein localization .", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA)-Reviews on Biomembranes, (19910000), vol. 1071, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0304-4157(91)90013-M, pages 83 - 101 ., XP023580330

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-4157(91)90013-M
    - LANFORD et al., "Induction of nuclear transport with a synthetic peptide homologous to the SV 40 T antigen transport signal.", Cell, (19860000), vol. 46, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(86)90883-4, pages 575 - 582 ., XP024245060

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(86)90883-4
    - DWORETZKY et al., "The effects of variations in the number and sequence of targeting signals on nuclear uptake.", The Journal of cell biology, (19880000), vol. 107, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.107.4.1279, pages 1279 - 1287 ., XP009140300

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.107.4.1279
    - ROBERTS et al., "The effect of protein context on nuclear location signal function.", Cell, (19870000), vol. 50, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(87)90500-9, pages 465 - 475, XP023883958

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(87)90500-9
    - KRAUER et al., "Identification of the nuclear localization signals within the Epstein-Barr virus EBNA- 6 protein.", Journal of general virology, (20040000), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 165 - 172 .
    - FISCHER-FANTUZZI et al., "Cell -dependent efficiency of reiterated nuclear signals in a mutant simian virus 40 oncoprotein targeted to the nucleus .", Molecular and cellular biology, (19880000), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 5495 - 5503 .
    - GARG et al., "Engineering synthetic TAL effectors with orthogonal target sites.", Nucleic Acids Research , gks404, (20120000), vol. 40, no. 15, pages 7584 - 7595
    - CERMAK et al., "Efficient design and assembly of custom TALEN and other TAL effector-based constructs for DNA targeting.", Nucleic acids research , gkr218, (20110000), doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkr218, pages 1 - 11, XP002659530

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr218
    - LI et al., "Modularly assembled designer TAL effector nucleases for targeted gene knockout and gene replacement in eukaryotes.", Nucleic acids research , gkr188, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1093/NAR/GKR188, pages 6315 - 6325, XP002681969

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKR188
    - LIU et al., "Epstein-Barr virus DNase contains two nuclear localization signals, which are different in sensitivity to the hydrophobic regions.", Virology, (19980000), vol. 247, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1006/viro.1998.9228, pages 62 - 73, XP004457887

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1998.9228
    - CAMPEAU et al., "A versatile viral system for expression and depletion of proteins in mammalian cells.", PloS one, (20090000), vol. 4, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0006529, page e6529 ., XP055251120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006529
    - RADULOVICH, N. et al., "Modified gateway system for double shRNA expression and Cre/lox based gene expression.", BMC Biotech., (20110322), vol. 11, pages 1 - 9
    - HÄNDEL, E. et al., "Versatile and efficient genome editing in human cells by combining zinc-finger nucleases with adeno-associated viral vectors.", Human Gene Ther., (20111007), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1089/hum.2011.140, pages 321 - 329, XP002730956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.140
    - JINEK, M. et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
    - MALI, P. et al., "RNA guided human genome engineering via CAS9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 823 - 826, XP055322657

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - HWANG, W. et al., "efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-CAS system", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - JINEK, M. et al., eLife, (20130000), page 2e00471
    - CHO, S. et al., "targeted genome engineering in human cells with the cas9 RNA guided endonuclease", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 230 - 232, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - CONG, L. et al., "multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/cas systems", Science, (20130215), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055236048

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
    - DELTCHEVA, E. et al., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, no. 7340, pages 602 - 607, XP055308803

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
    - BROUNS, S., "a swiss army knife of immunity", Science, (20120817), vol. 337, pages 808 - 809, XP055113718

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1227253
    - GASIUNAS, G. et al., "cas9 cRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (20120000), pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - CAMPEAU, E. et al., "a versatile viral system for expression and depletion of proteins in mammalian cells", PLoS ONE, (20090000), vol. 4, page E6529, XP055251120

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006529
    - RADULOVICH, N. et al., "modified gateway system for double shRNA expression and Cre7lox based gene expression", BMC Biotech., (20110000), pages 11 - 24, XP021096706

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-11-24
    - HANDEL, E. et al., "Versatile and efficient genome editing in human cells by combining zinc-finger nucleases with adeno-associated viral vectors", Human Gene Ther., (20120000), vol. 23, pages 321 - 329, XP002730956

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2011.140
    - URNOV, F. et al., "genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", Nat. Rev. Gene ., (20100000), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646, XP055198280

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842
    - JOUNG, J et al., "Talens a widely applicable techniology for targeted genome editing", Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20130000), vol. 14, pages 49 - 55, XP055282847

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3486
    - NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF GENERAL MEDICAL SCIENCES, Freedom of Info Act
    - NiH Reporter project information for research grant no. 1R01 DK 097768-01
    - ALTSHULER et al., Evidence of report of date of publication
    - L. FISCHER-FANTUZZI et al., Mol Cell Biol, (19880000), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 5495 - 5503
    - FIECK et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (19920000), vol. 20, no. 7, pages 1785 - 1791
    - DAI et al., "The Transcription Factors GATA4 and dHAND Physically Interact to Synergistically Activate Cardiac Gene Expression through a p300-dependent Mechanism", J. Biol. Chem., (20020507), vol. 277, no. 27);, pages 24390 - 8;, XP055251716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202490200
    - PARK et al., "regulation of ribosomal s6 inase 2 by mammalian target of rapamycin", J. Biol. Chem., (20020823), vol. 277, no. 35, pages 31423 - 31429, XP055251717

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M204080200
    - PLANEY et al., "inhibition of glucocortocoid-induced apoptosis in 697 pre b lymphocytes by the mineralocorticoid receptor n terminal domain", J. Biol. Chem., (20021101), vol. 277, no. 44, pages 42188 - 96, XP055251719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M205085200
    - DICARLO et al., "genome engineering in saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-cas systems", Nucleic Acids Res., vol. 41, pages 4336 - 4343, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - CHANG et al., "genome editing with RNA guided CAS9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos", Cell Research, vol. 23, no. 4, pages 465 - 472, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - SHEN et al., "generation of gene modified mice via Cas97RNA-mediated gene targeting", Cell Research, vol. 23, no. 5, pages 720 - 723, XP055141533

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.46
    - CHYLINSKI et al., "the tracrRNA and Cas9 families of type II CRISPR Cas immunity systems", RNA Biol., pages 726 - 737, XP055116068

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/rna.24321
    - WANG et al., "one step generation of mice carrying mutations in multiple genes by CRISPR cas mediated genome engineering", Cell, vol. 153, no. 4, pages 910 - 8, XP028538358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025
    - GAJ et al., "ZFN TALEN and CRISPR/ Cas based methods for genome engineering", Trends in Biotechnology, vol. 31, no. 7, pages 397 - 405, XP055065263

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004
    - GRATZ et al., "genome engineering of drosophila with the CRISPR RNA guided Cas9 nuclease", Genetics, vol. 194, pages 1029 - 1035, XP055102690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.152710
    - XIAO et al., "chromosomal deletions and inversions mediated by TALENS and CRISPR/Cas in zebrafish", Nucl. Acid Res, vol. 1, no. 14, page e141, XP055098101

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt464
    - GILBERT et al., "CRISPR mediated modular RNA guided regulation of transcription in eukaryotes", Cell, vol. 154, no. 2, pages 442 - 51, XP055321615

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044
    - HSU et al., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA guided Cas9 nucleases", Nature Biotech, vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 834, XP055219426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647
    - GUSTAFSSON et al., "codon bias and heterologous protein expression", Trends Biotechnol, (20040000), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 346 - 53, XP004520507

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2004.04.006
    - CHIU et al., "engineered GFP as a vital reporter in plants", Current Biology, (19960000), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 325 - 330, XP000942576

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00483-9
    - SCHRAMM et al., Genes. Dev., (20020000), vol. 16, pages 2593 - 2620
    - FOECKING, Gene, (19860000), vol. 45, pages 101 - 5
    - O'HARE, PNAS, (19810000), vol. 78, pages 1527 - 1531
    - PATTERSON, J Ind Microbiol. Biotechnol, (20050000), vol. 32, pages 115 - 123
    - REBAR, Nature Medicine, (20020000), vol. 8, pages 1427 - 32
    - URNOV, "Highly efficient endogenous human gene correction using designed zinc-finger nucleases", Nature, (20050000), vol. 435, no. 7042, pages 646 - 51, XP002467423

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03556
    - CERMAK, Nucleic Acid Res., (20110000), vol. 39, page e82
    - MILLER, "A TALE nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing", Nature Biotechnology, (20110000), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 143 - 48, XP055077697

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755
    - CHOULIKA, "Transfer of single gene-containing long terminal repeats into the genome of mammalian cells by a retroviral vector carrying the cre gene and the loxP site", J Virol., (19960000), vol. 70, pages 1792 - 1798, XP002182220
    - BODEN, Mol. Ther., (20040000), vol. 9, pages 396 - 402
    - TISCORNIA, Delivery and expression of DNA and RNA
    - SATO, Biosci. Biotechnol. Biochem., (20090000), vol. 73, pages 2145 - 2148
    - LOMBARDO, Nature Biotech, (20070000), vol. 25, pages 1298 - 1306
    - Assignment of inventor Cong 6 Reel/Frame 033219/0097-0103
    - Assignment of inventor Cong Reel/Frame 033219/0119-0122
    - Assignment of inventor Cong Reel/Frame 033228/0056-0062
    - Assignment of inventor Cong 59 Reel/Frame 033228/0326-0330
    - Assignment of inventor Cong Reel/Frame 033228/0625-0629
    - BASSETT et al., Cell Rep, (20130000), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 220 - 228
    - KONDO et al., Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, no. 3, pages 715 - 721
    - SEBO et al., Fly, (20140000), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 52 - 57
    - YU et al., Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, no. 1, pages 289 - 291
    - YANG et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 154, no. 6, pages 1370 - 1379
    - PRIMO et al., Exp Dermatol, (20120000), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 162 - 170
    - YI et al., Curr Gene Ther., (20110000), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 218 - 228
    - SINQER et al., Curr Gene Ther., (20080000), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 483 - 488
    - BARRANGOU., Nat. Biotechnol, (20120000), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 836 - 838
    - ANDREAS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, no. 11, pages 2299 - 2306
    - Printout from Luciano Marraffini's website
    - CAROLL, Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 1660
    - Alignments showing sequence identity between guide sequences
    - RAYMOND et al., Plos One, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 1
    - LI et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 6315 - 6325
    - TINLAND et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 89, pages 7442 - 7446
    - BAKER, Nature Biotechnology, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 309 - 312
    - CHRISTIAN et al., Genetics, (20100000), vol. 186, pages 757 - 761
    - LANGE et al., JBC, (20070000), vol. 282, pages 5101 - 5105
    - SHIEH et al., Plant Physiol, (19930000), vol. 101353 -
    - WELCH et al., Methods in Enzymology, (20110000), vol. 498, pages 43 - 66
    - MUSSOLINO et al., Curr Opin Biotechnol, (20120000), vol. 23, pages 644 - 650
    - BOUARD et al., British Journal of Pharmacology, (20090000), vol. 157, pages 153 - 165
    - XIE et al., Molecular Plant, (20130000), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 1975 - 1983
    - LUO et al., Traffice, (20040000), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 847 - 854
    - DO et al., FEBS Letters, vol. 580, no. 7, pages 1865 - 1871
    - KOSUGI et al., JBC, (20090000), vol. 84, no. 1);, pages 478 - 485
    - DINGWALL et al., Cell, (19820000), vol. 30, pages 449 - 458
    - FREITAS et al., Curr. Genom ;, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 550 - 557
    - KALDERON et al., Cell, (19840000), vol. 39, pages 499 - 509
    - DINGWALL et al., JBC;, (19880000), vol. 107, pages 841 - 849
    - ROBERTS et al., Cell, (19870000), pages 465 - 475
    - WOLFF et al., Nat. Biotechnology, (20010000), vol. 19, pages 1118 - 1120
    - New England Biolabs web page-Cas9 Nuclease NLS S.pyogenes product page
    - VAN DEN ACKERVEKEN et al., Cell, vol. 87, pages 1307 - 1316
    - IMAGAWA et al., FEBS Lett;, (20000000), vol. 484, pages 118 - 124
    - FISCHER-FANTUZZI et al., Mol Cell Biol;, (19880000), vol. 8, pages 5495 - 5508
    - Declaration from Dr. Jens Boch
    - Exhibit A of D26 and publication list of Dr. Jens Boch
    - Assignment to the President and Fellows of Harvard College
    - Assignment recordal at USPTO Reel 033219/Frame 0097
    - Assignment recordal at USPTO Reel 034124/Frame 0526
    - Assignment recordal at USPTO Reel 033331/Frame 0578
    - Evidence of online publication of Joung and Sander
    - AU et al., Virology;, (20080000), vol. 385, pages 209 - 217
    - GREENSPAN et al., J Virol;, (19880000), vol. 62, no. 8, pages 3020 - 3026
    - MORIN et al., Mol Cell Biol;, (19890000), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 4372 - 4380
    - NAGARAJAN et al., J Immunol., (20040000), vol. 173, no. 1, pages 410 - 419
    - CHAN et al., J Cell Biol, (19980000), vol. 143, no. 1, pages 49 - 63
    - RODRIGUES et al., J Bact., (20010000), vol. 183, no. 12, pages 3791 - 3794
    - LOS et al., Cell Notes., (20060000), vol. 14, pages 10 - 14
    - CARR et al., Nature Biotech;, (20090000), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1151 - 1162
    - Vector map for Pst1374
    - ALBERTS, Molecular Biology of the cell, (20020000), pages 671 - 676
    - CARROLL et al., Gene Ther;, (20080000), vol. 15, page 1463
    - HICKS et al., Annu Rev Cell Dev Biol;, (19950000), vol. 11, pages 155 - 88
    - ROBERTS et al., Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA, vol. 1008, no. 3, pages 263 - 280
    - GARCIA-BUSTOS et al., Biochimica et Biophysica Acta (BBA);, vol. 1071, no. 1, pages 83 - 101
    - LANFORD et al., Cell, (19860000), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 575 - 582
    - DWORETZKY et al., The Journal of cell biology, (19880000), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 1279 - 1287
    - KRAUER et al., Journal of general virology;, vol. 85, no. 1, pages 165 - 172
    - GARG et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20120000), vol. 40, no. 15, pages 7584 - 7595
    - LIU et al., Virology;, vol. 247, no. 1, pages 62 - 73
    - Vector map of Invitrogens Pcmv/MYC/nuc vector
    - NAKAI et al., Trends in Biochem Sciences, (19990000), vol. 24, pages 34 - 35
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of S. pyogenes serotype M1 Cas 9
    - Result of PSORT II analysis of S. pyogenes serotype M4 Cas 9
    - LYSSENKO et al., Biotechniques, (20070000), vol. 43, pages 596 - 600
    - BAIKER et al., Journal of Virology, (20040000), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1181 - 1194
    - ZOLKIEWSKA, Cell Mol Life Sci;, (20080000), vol. 65, no. 13, pages 2056 - 2068
    - Declaration Lord Hoffmann
    - Declaration John Doll
    - Declaration Judge Michel
    - Declaration 1 Thomas Kowalski + Annex
    - Declaration 2 Thomas Kowalski + Annex
    - Declaration Smitha Uthaman
    - LAMBOWITZ et al., "Group II introns: Mobile Ribozymes that invade DNA", Cold Sprinq Harbor Perspectives Bioloqy, (20110000), vol. 3, page a003616
    - ROMANI et al., "Hormonal regulation of Mg2+ transport and homeostasis in eukaryotic cells", BioMetals, (20020000), vol. 15, pages 271 - 283
    - MASTROIANNI et al., "Group II Intron-Based Gene Targeting Reactions in Eukaryotes", PLoS ONE, (20080000), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0003121, page e3121, XP055149290

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003121
    - LINK et al., "Engineering ligand-responsive gene -control elements: lessons learned from natural riboswitches", Gene Therapy, (20090000), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1038/gt.2009.81, pages 1189 - 1201, XP008148752

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2009.81
    - KOSEKI et al., "Factors governing the activity in vivo of ribozymes transcribed by RNA polymerase III", J. Viroloqy, (19990000), vol. 73, pages 1868 - 1877, XP001027031
    - MARRAFFINI et al., "CRISPR Interference Limitis Horizontal Gene Transfer in Staphylococci by Tarqetinq DNA", Science, (20080000), vol. 322, pages 1843 - 1845
    - GARNEAU et al., "The CRISPR/Cas bacterial immune system cleaves bacteriophaqe and plasmid DNA", Nature, (20100000), vol. 468, pages 67 - 71, XP055181397

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09523
    - PANDIKA et al., Jennifer Doudna, CRISPR code killer
    - WAGNER et al., "Efficient CRISPR/ Cas9-mediated genome editing in P. falciparum", Nat. Methods, (20140000), vol. 11, pages 915 - 918, XP055336954

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.3063
    - PLATT et al., "CRISPR/Cas9 Knockin Mice for Genome Editing and Cancer Modelinq", Cell, (20140000), vol. 159, pages 440 - 455, XP029073412

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.09.014
    - FENG et al., "Expanding CRISPR/Cas9 genome editing capacity in zebrafish usinq SaCas9, G3 (Bethesda", (20160800), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 2517 - 2521, XP055336953

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/g3.116.031914
    - WIRTZ et al., "Regulated processive transcription of chromatin by T7 RNA polymerase in Trypanosoma brucei", Nucleic Acids Res., (19980000), vol. 26, no. 20, pages 4626 - 4634, XP000872845

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.20.4626
    - O'NEILL et al., "Nucleosome arrays inhibit both initiation and elongation of transcripts by bacteriophage T7 RNA polymerase", J. Molecular Biology, (19920000), vol. 223, no. 1, pages 67 - 78, XP024018312

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(92)90716-W
    - MCCALL et al., "Probes of chromatin accessibility in the Drosophila bithorax complex respond differently to Polycomb-mediated repression", EMBO J., (19960000), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 569 - 580, XP004037251
    - JENUWEIN et al., "The immunoglobulin mu enhancer core establishes local factor access in nuclear chromatin independent of transcriptional stimulation", Genes & Dev., vol. 7, no. 10, pages 2016 - 2032, XP055336949

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.7.10.2016
    - Evidence of named inventors for P1-P12 (retrieved from USPTO
    - Assignment recorded at USPTO Reel 032309/Frame 0575
    - Assignment recorded at USPTO Reel 031945/Frame 0515
    - Assignment recorded at USPTO Reel 032310/Frame 0184
    - Assignment recorded at USPTO Reel 032310/Frame 0026
    - Assignment recordal at USPTO for P1-P12
    - Assignment recordal at USPTO for A1
    - Executed assignments of Marraffini, Bikard, Jiang, Platt and Sanjana
    - Evidence of the named Inventors for each respective priority application P1-P12
    - Evidence of assignment recordal from the named Inventors to the Assignees for each respective priority application P1-P12
    - GASIUNAS et al., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive Immunity in bacteria'';", PNAS, (20120000), vol. 109, no. 39, pages 15539 - 40, XP055068588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109
    - National Institute of General Medical Sciences / ''Freedom of Information Act
    - L. FISCHER-FANTUZZI et al., "Cell -dependent efficiency of reiterated nuclear signals in a mutant simian virus 40 oncoprotein targeted to the nucleus'';", Mol Cell Biol., (19880000), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 5495 - 5503, XP009140368

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.8.12.549
    - PARK et al., "Regulation of ribosomal 56 kinase 2 by mammalian target of rapamycin'';", J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, no. 35, pages 31423 - 31429, XP055251717

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M204080200
    - MALI et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9'';", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055248658

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
    - CONG et al., "Multiplex genome engineering using CRISPR/Cas systems'';", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055181424

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1229223
    - JINEK et al., "RNA- programmed genome editing In human cells'';", eLife, vol. 2, (20130000), page e00471;, URL: http://elifesciences.org/content/2/e00471, XP055245475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
    - CHO et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA- guided endonuclease'';", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, page 230;, XP002699850

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507
    - HWANG et al., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system'", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501
    - DICARLO et al., "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems'';", Nucleic Acids Res., (20130000), vol. 41, page 4336;, XP055086617

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135
    - CHANG et al., "Genome editing with RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease in zebrafish embryos'';", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, no. 4, page 465;, XP055251146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.45
    - XIAO et al., "Chromosomal deletions and inversions mediated by TALENs and CRISPR/Cas in zebrafish'';", Nucl. Acid Res., (20130000), vol. 1, no. 14, page e141;, XP055098101

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt464
    - XIE et al., "RNA-guided genome editing in plants using CRISPR-Cas system'';", Molecular Plant ( Cell Press, (20131100), vol. 6, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1093/mp/sst119, pages 1975 - 1983, XP055154141

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/mp/sst119
    - YU et al., "Highly efficient genome modifications mediated by CRISPR/Cas9 in Drosophila", Genetics, (20130900), vol. 95, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1534/genetics.113.153825, pages 289 - 91, XP055242275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.153825
    - SHIEH et al., "Nuclear Targeting of the maize R protein requires two nuclear localization sequences'';", Plant Physiol., (19930000), vol. 101, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1104/pp.101.2.353, pages 353 - 361, XP055241771

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.101.2.353
    - LUO et al., "Multiple nuclear localization sequences allow modulation of 5- lipoxygenase nuclear import'';", Traffic, (20040000), vol. 5, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1600-0854.2004.00227.x, pages 847 - 54, XP055267791

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0854.2004.00227.x
    - DO et al., "Identification of multiple nuclear localization signals in murine Elf3, an ETS transcription factor", FEBS Letters, (20060000), vol. 580, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/j.febslet.2006.02.049, pages 1865 - 71, XP028030315

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2006.02.049
    - LANGE et al., "Classical nuclear localization signals: definition, function, and interaction with importin alpha", J. Biol. Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, no. 8, doi:doi:DOI:10.1074/JBC.R600026200, pages 5101 - 5, XP002674492

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1074/JBC.R600026200
    - KOSUGI et al., "Six classes of nuclear localization signals specific to different binding grooves of importin alpha'';", J. Biol. Chem., (20090000), vol. 84, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M807017200, pages 478 - 85, XP055267734

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M807017200
    - LI et al., "Modularly assembled designer TAL effector nucleases for targeted gene knockout and gene replacement in eukaryotes", Nucleic Acids Res., (20110000), vol. 39, no. 14, pages 6315 - 25, XP002681969

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKR188
    - REYON et al., "FLASH assembly of TALENs for high-throughput genome editing", Nat Biotechnol., (20120500), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 460 - 465, XP055171172

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2170
    - "A Whig History of CRISPR", genotopia, (20160118), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://genotopia.scienceblog .com/573/a-whig-history-of-crispr/, XP055539515
    - "Outrage Is Shaping The Battle Over Crispr", wired.com, (20160100), URL: https://www.wired.com/2016/01/crispr-twitter-fight, XP055539517
    - Joanna Rothkopf, "How One Man Tried to Write Women Out of CRISPR Biggest Biotech Innovation in Decades", jezebel.com, (20160120), URL: https://jezebel.com/how-one-man-tried-to-write-women-out-ot-crispr-the-big-17539996281, XP055539520
    - tabitha .M, "Is Lander's revisionist CRISPR history sexist?", blogs.plos.org/, (20160201), URL: https://blogs.plos.org/blog/2016/02/01 /is-landers-revision ist-crispr-histor-sexist, XP055539522
    - OAKES et al., "Profiling of engineering hotspots identifies an allosteric CRISPR-Cas9 switch", Nature Biotech, (20160000), pages 1 - 8, XP055378225

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3528
    - KOURANOVA et al., "CRISPRs for Optimal Targeting: Delivery of CRISPR Components as DNA, RNA, and Protein into Cultured Cells and Single- Cell Embryos", H um. Gene . Ther., (20160000), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 464 - 75, XP055465083

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2016.009
    - HU et al., "Comparison of Various Nuclear Localization Signal-Fused Cas9 Proteins and Cas9 mRNA for Genome Editing in Zebrafish", G3 Genes|Genomes|Genetics, (20180000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 823 - 831, XP055513510

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/g3.117.300359
    - "CHAPTER 12", ALBERTS et al., Molecular Biology of the Cell, (20080000), pages 702 - 709, XP055539504
    - YANG et al., "HIV-1 TAT-mediated protein transduction and subcellular localization using novel expression vectors", FEBS Letters, (20020000), vol. 532, pages 36 - 44, XP004395339

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(02)03624-4