Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808268

EP2808268 - Equipment to treat bulk products, flexible container or bag for bulk products and process for treating bulk products by such equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.01.2016  [2016/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aguilar Monforte, Carlos
C. La Vinya, 35
08480 L'Ametlla del Vallès / ES
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Ponti & Partners, S.L.P
C. de Consell de Cent 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Oficina Ponti, SLP
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date14170601.030.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateES20130030674U30.05.2013         Original published format: ES 201330674 U
[2014/49]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808268
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/20, B65D88/16, B65B55/00, B65B31/04, B65B57/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Ausrüstung zur Behandlung von Schüttgut, flexibler Behälter oder Beutel für Schüttgut und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Schüttgut durch solch eine Ausrüstung[2014/49]
English:Equipment to treat bulk products, flexible container or bag for bulk products and process for treating bulk products by such equipment[2014/49]
French:Équipement pour traiter des produits en vrac, récipient ou sac flexible pour produits en vrac et procédé de traitement de produits en vrac par un tel appareil[2014/49]
Examination procedure30.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
04.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/03]
10.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/03]
30.07.2015Request for conversion into a national application, for ES [2015/37]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013098785  (STEFFENS MARCOS ANDRE [SG]) [X] 1,10,14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010]; figures 3,5,7-9,12,19 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0069] *;
 [Y]ES2340898  (PROTECTPACK S L AG [ES]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0656852  (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]; CORNELIUSSEN CHRISTIAN [NO]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 44 - line 52; figures 8-10; claims 1-2 * * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 9 *;
 [A]US2002078661  (BOWDEN LISA A [US] ET AL) [A] 1,10,15 * figures 14-15 *;
 [A]US5299917  (SCHULTZ GLEN R [US]) [A] 7 * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 2; figures 11,13 *;
 [A]US5558137  (FUTERMAN CHARLES S [GB]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2008057163  (KEGLER ANDREW [US] ET AL) [A] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048]; figures 3-4 *